Lemoine v. State Farm General Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Charles Lemoine
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv02941
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
November 16, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted to State Farm. While State Farm styled its motion as one for partial summary judgment, it does not appear that any causes of action are left based on Claim 1 or Claim 2. Therefore, State Farm is entitled to summary judgment in full. Entry of judgment will be delayed 14 days following the entry of this Order. If either party feels that an existing cause of action or claim remains, they may notify the Court of that in writing within 10 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
September 30, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/30/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemoine v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lemoine
Represented By: Michael Cayabyab Mercado
Represented By: Kent Pearce Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen P. Ellingson
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Represented By: Cherie M. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?