Fleming v. The Charles Schwab Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Francis X. Fleming, Jr.
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles R. Schwab, Walter W. Bettinger, II and UBS Securities LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02945
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendant Charles R. Schwab Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 14, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS RE [#31 and #33] AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/14/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
August 20, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Rescind the Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order and to Remove the Litigation from the ADR Multi-Option Program. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/20/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. The Charles Schwab Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis X. Fleming, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Brown
Represented By: Benny Copeline Goodman, III
Represented By: Ashley Price
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Represented By: Gilbert Ross Serota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert Ross Serota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Schwab
Represented By: Gilbert Ross Serota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter W. Bettinger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?