Serrano v. Progressive Financial Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Margarita Serrano
Defendant: Progressive Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02985
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [Re 27 Notice (Other) filed by Progressive Financial Services, Inc.]. ALL DEADLINES AND HEARINGS REMAIN IN PLACE UNTIL A DISMISSAL IS FILED. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/24/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 3, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 4, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/4/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano v. Progressive Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Serrano
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Suren Naradha Weerasuriya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?