Edward Rotstein, et al v. Terrafusion, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Terrafusion International, Inc. and Edward Rotstein
Defendant: Terrafusion, Inc. and MCC Partners NY LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02993
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND INSTRUCTING PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED BY WAY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 9, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING ANSWER FILED BY MARK CUKIER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 3, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
November 28, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 41 Request to shorten time and denying request for immediate withdrawal as counsel.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 27, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 26 Administrative Motion. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
September 25, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward Rotstein, et al v. Terrafusion, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrafusion International, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Alexander Duplanty
Represented By: Suzanne Elaine Rischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Rotstein
Represented By: Todd Alexander Duplanty
Represented By: Suzanne Elaine Rischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrafusion, Inc.
Represented By: Zvi Aria Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCC Partners NY LLC
Represented By: Zvi Aria Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?