Cashella Benjamin v. Caroline W. Colvin

Plaintiff: Cashella Benjamin
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv02995
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 24 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
August 5, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 3, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFFERAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 16, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO INFORM COURT WHETHER SHE CONSENTS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/16/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashella Benjamin v. Caroline W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Marcelo N Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cashella Benjamin
Represented By: Steven F. Bruce, PWDF
Represented By: Steven Frederick Egler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?