Lindsey v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Plaintiff: Laurie Lindsey
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03006
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge William H. Orrick re 57 and 58 Motions in Limine. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 12, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
November 30, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/30/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
July 22, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference continued to 11/3/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 16, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court **PLEASE DISREGARD - POSTED IN INCORRECT MATTER**TENTATIVE RULINGS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015) Modified on 7/16/2015 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/1/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Lindsey
Represented By: Bailey Bifoss
Represented By: Stephen R. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay Stevens Fitch
Represented By: Mark P. Grajski
Represented By: Geoffrey Christopher Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?