Nokchan v. Lyft, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Nokchan
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03008
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 31 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing complaint without prejudice to refiling in state court. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
July 24, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Archis Parasharami ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9700967.) filed by Lyft, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/24/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 23, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 7 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Lyft's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Lyft, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/23/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nokchan v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Represented By: Ruth Zadikany
Represented By: John Peter Zaimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nokchan
Represented By: Tuvia Korobkin
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?