Snyder v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: Pamela Snyder
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Michael Ferguson
Case Number: 3:2015cv03049
Filed: June 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 16:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRING ACTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/26/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
December 11, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/11/2015.is***Parties shall complete Mediation, not Private ADR by 4/30/16.***(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 13, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
October 16, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/16/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Snyder
Represented By: Ken-Linh Hoang
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Sara Janett Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ferguson
Represented By: Arturo Esteban Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?