Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC v. Google Inc.

Plaintiff: Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03065
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Spero on 10/13/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
August 24, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Ni.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 20, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 23 Stipulation to Continue the Deadline to File the Case Management Statement.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC
Represented By: Kris S. LeFan
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Marcus Alan Barber
Represented By: John W Downing
Represented By: Darcy Lachelle Jones
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Represented By: Heather S. Kim
Represented By: Jeffrey James Toney
Represented By: Jonathan Keith Waldrop
Represented By: Robert Perry Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?