Elpidio et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Plaintiff: Monica Rodriguez Elpidio and Maria J. Barahona
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, SFPP, L.P., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "D and Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03071
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 19 Motion to Intervene; granting 20 Motion to Transfer Case (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
July 20, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/20/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 7, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. James Donato. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/7/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elpidio et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Rodriguez Elpidio
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria J. Barahona
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPP, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?