Namystiuk v. Barney

Plaintiff: Denys Namystiuk
Defendant: Smith Barney
Case Number: 3:2015cv03078
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 63 RECENTLY FILED MOTION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
January 28, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TRANSCRIPT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
December 21, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/21/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 16, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 35 RECENTLY FILED MOTION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 7, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 28 SECOND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 30, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 24 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/29/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
August 31, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS 8 13 14 3 (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
July 13, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING CLARIFICATION re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Denys Namystiuk. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/13/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Namystiuk v. Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denys Namystiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?