Bighorn Capital, Inc. v. Security National Guaranty, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bighorn Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Security National Guaranty, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03083
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 80 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/7/16. ***Civil Case Terminated(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
February 5, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPERATION. Jury Selection set for 12/5/2016 at 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2016 at 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2016 at 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/5/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
December 30, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM; AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS RULE 11 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong granting 60 Motion to Dismiss; denying 66 Motion for Sanctions. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
August 24, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDMENT TO 51 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/21/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
July 22, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BREIFING SCHEDULE as to 32 Ex Parte Application to Enlarge Time and Open Discovery. Responses due by 7/24/2015. Replies due by 7/27/2015. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/22/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 21, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE AND DENYING 17 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/21/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 17, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bighorn Capital, Inc. v. Security National Guaranty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bighorn Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W. Ballesteros
Represented By: Justine Marie Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security National Guaranty, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Raymond Zfaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?