Johnson et al v. Keolis America
Plaintiff: Sandra Johnson and Jerome Primes
Defendant: Keolis America
Case Number: 3:2015cv03104
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING February 11, 2016 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/20/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiffs choose to amend their Complaint, they must do so by 12/31/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONTINUING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Keolis America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Johnson
Represented By: William Clarence McNeill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Primes
Represented By: William Clarence McNeill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keolis America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?