Federal Insurance Company et al v. McDouglass Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company and Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: McDouglass Group, Inc, Tyler Douglass and Andy McCullough
Case Number: 3:2015cv03123
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal filed by McDouglass Group, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Andy McCullough, Federal Insurance Company, Tyler Douglass, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/20/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
November 17, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss the third, fourth, and sixth causes of action with leave to amend. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 14 days of this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
September 30, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Federal Insurance Company and McDouglass Group, Inc. filed by McDouglass Group, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Andy McCullough, Federal Insurance Company, Tyler Douglass, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/30/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company et al v. McDouglass Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Anthony DiPietra, Jr.
Represented By: Gene Allen Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Kathleen M. DeLaney
Represented By: George Edward Rudloff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDouglass Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?