McPherson v. Grounds et al

Plaintiff: Emory McPherson
Defendant: Randy Grounds, R. Parin, P. Gonzales, Alamo and Ray
Case Number: 3:2015cv03145
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/24/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 10, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Ray. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
July 22, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/22/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPherson v. Grounds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Parin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?