Martinez v. Federal Express Corporation

Plaintiff: Caroline Martinez
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03155
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING DATES [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] re 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Corresponding Deadlines filed by Caroline Martinez, Federal Express Corporation. Case Management Statemen t due by 6/13/2016. Non-Expert Discovery due by 5/17/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/31/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2016 is CONTINUED to 6/20/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
October 26, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/26/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
July 24, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/24/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Martinez
Represented By: John B. Kenney
Represented By: Alan Jay Reinach
Represented By: Daniel D. Renz
Represented By: James Andrew Sonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Charles W. Matheis, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher James Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?