Huang v. Avalanche Biotechnologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joe Huang
Defendant: Avalanche Biotechnologies, Inc., Thomas W Chalberg, Jr. and Linda C Bain
Case Number: 3:2015cv03185
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2017 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on March 20, 2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
November 3, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. James Donato granting 74 98 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
December 17, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 17 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; denying 21 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; and granting 26 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
September 23, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating Related Actions; Setting The Time For Defendants' Response To Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint And Any Related Briefing; And Staying Discovery And Other Activities. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/22/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Avalanche Biotechnologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Huang
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalanche Biotechnologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W Chalberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda C Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?