Hariri-Vijeh v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mojdeh Hariri-Vijeh
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv03195
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 14 Motion to Strike (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
October 27, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/27/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
September 28, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING OPPOSITION BRIEF; VACATING HEARING re 15 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Mojdeh Hariri-Vijeh. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/28/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
August 3, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/3/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hariri-Vijeh v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mojdeh Hariri-Vijeh
Represented By: Rebecca Grey
Represented By: Lauren Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Royal Forest Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?