Burke v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: James Burke
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv03196
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
March 17, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CONTINUE HEARING DATE granting 21 Motions due by 4/14/2016. Replies due by 5/5/2016. Responses due by 4/28/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/17/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
September 25, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE ALSUP re 10 Clerk's Notice,. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burke
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?