Vengris v. Performance Food Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dwayne Vengris
Defendant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03223
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Stipulation filed by Dwayne Vengris. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/19/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
September 30, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re motion to dismiss and/or strike. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/30/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 14, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/14/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
August 27, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/27/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
July 16, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/16/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vengris v. Performance Food Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Vengris
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: William David Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?