Thomas E Perez v. National Consolidated Couriers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: National Consolidated Couriers, Inc., Tanweer Ahmed, Ironstone NCCI Logistics and Amira Khalaf
Case Number: 3:2015cv03224
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 9 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 3, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/3/2015. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
July 15, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT & ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/15/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 14, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/14/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas E Perez v. National Consolidated Couriers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Natalie A Nardecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Consolidated Couriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanweer Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironstone NCCI Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amira Khalaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?