Hayter et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation

Plaintiff: Jonathan Hayter and Sandryna Hayter
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03332
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/28/2017. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
July 21, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-2: Discovery due by 8/29/2016. Dispositive motions heard by 11/3/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 12/12/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco befor e Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/20/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 19, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. The court grants the defendant's motion. The plaintiffs' intrusion-upon-seclusion claim is dismissed with leave to amend. The plaintiffs have 28 days from the date of this o rder to amend their intrusion claim. If they do not, then the dismissal will be with prejudice. The plaintiffs have also "stipulate[d] to the dismissal of" their wrongful-foreclosure claim. (ECF No. 46 at 2.) That claim is dismissed. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayter et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hayter
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandryna Hayter
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?