Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. v. Shine International Transportation (ShenZhen) Limited

Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd.
Defendant: Shine International Transportation (ShenZhen) Limited
Case Number: 3:2015cv03343
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd., Troy Container Line, Ltd., R.T. Express International, Inc., Shine International Transportation (ShenZhen) Limited, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/1/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
June 10, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION With Regard to Amending the Court's April 8, 2016 Order re Deadline to Dismiss filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. Parties shall either file a dismissal or a joint status report by 8/1/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/10/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
April 8, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 59 Notice of Settlement filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. Plaintiff shall file a dismissal within 60 days of this order, absent any extension ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/8/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 21, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 3/29/16 case management conference, filed by R.T. Express International, Inc. Counsel shall arrange the appearance with CourtCall prior to the hearing date. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/21/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 17, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Request to appear telephonically at the 3/29/16 case management conference, filed by Shine International Transportation (ShenZhen) Limited. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/17/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 3/29/2016 case management conference, filed by Troy Container Line, Ltd. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/16/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
January 15, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2016 01:30 PM. Deadline to respond to Amended Complaint is 2/5/16.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/15/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
November 30, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Aside Default and Service of Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd., Shine International Transportation (ShenZhen) Limited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/30/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. v. Shine International Transportation (ShenZhen) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd.
Represented By: Conte C. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shine International Transportation (ShenZhen) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?