Schwartz v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Kristopher A. Schwartz
Defendant: Art Cook, Roger Stanger, Ronald Zimmerman, Buckles-Smith Electric Company and Bankers Trust Company of South Dakota
Miscellaneous: Buckles-Smith Electric Company Employee Ownership Stock Plan
Case Number: 3:2015cv03347
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/30/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING 130 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; AND GRANTING 129 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/15/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, PRELIMINARILY CERTIFYING A SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPROVING FORMS AND METHODS OF NOTICE, AND SETTING A FAIRNESS HEARING (granting 116 ). Fairness Hearing set for 6/15/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/20/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 66 PLAINTIFF'S AND DENYING 85 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/4/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Stipulation and Order 63 (Modified by Court) signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/27/16. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 34 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher A. Schwartz
Represented By: James A. Bloom
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Stanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckles-Smith Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Trust Company of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Buckles-Smith Electric Company Employee Ownership Stock Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?