Brackin v. California Department of State Hospitals et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Brackin
Defendant: California Department of State Hospitals, Napa State Hospital, Dolly Matteucci, Cindy Black, Katie Cooper, Harold Collins, Fiona Monta and Elpidlo Capicoy
Case Number: 3:2015cv03351
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION, AND ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 63 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 5, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
September 19, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court PETITION AND ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PURPOSES OF SETTLEMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 52 Motion to Appoint guardian ad Litem..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 14, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER REQUEST FOR INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 12, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR INFORMATION RE GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
July 19, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT REQUEST TO MODIFY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, Motions terminated: 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order and Order filed by Shawn Brackin. Motions due by 9/29/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/29/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
June 8, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, AND (3) DENYING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Leave to File. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 26, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
September 29, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 15 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 3, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 4, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/4/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brackin v. California Department of State Hospitals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Brackin
Represented By: Karl James Frisinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of State Hospitals
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa State Hospital
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolly Matteucci
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Black
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Cooper
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Collins
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiona Monta
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elpidlo Capicoy
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?