Charlotte B Milliner et al v. Mutual Securities, Inc.

Plaintiff: Charlotte B. Milliner and Joanne Brem
Defendant: Mutual Securities, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03354
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER (Partially Redacted) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Protective Order and partially holding motion in abeyance; granting 173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed on 7/8/2019. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/11/2018. ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: ESTABLISHMENT OF QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/6/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part MSI's 121 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's March 18, 2017 Order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/11/2017.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 109 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Damages. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/30/17. The motion hearing and further case management conference scheduled for July 10, 2017 are hereby VACATED.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting MSI's 91 Motion to Amend Discovery Responses and 90 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/15/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 81 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Referred Back to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Discovery. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/24/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: Suitability and Denying 72 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: Undisputed Material Facts. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/17/17.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2017)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Re: Defendant's Responses to Requests for Admissions 61 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/6/17. Admissions due by 2/17/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017).
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 41 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Re: MSI Duty to Supervise Bock and Evans. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 9/19/16.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Re: September 12, 2016 Hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/08/16. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 6/27/2016. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Regarding May 23, 2016 Hearing. Motion Hearing reset for 6/20/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/20/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 5/18/2016. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charlotte B Milliner et al v. Mutual Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte B. Milliner
Represented By: Charles David Marshall
Represented By: David Sturgeon-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Brem
Represented By: Charles David Marshall
Represented By: David Sturgeon-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Fredricks
Represented By: Shelly C. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?