United States of America v. Zwaal

Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: James E. Zwaal
Case Number: 3:2015cv03378
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Reassignment by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
July 23, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Show Cause Re Enforcement of Internal Revenue Service Summons by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Respondent James E. Zwall is ordered to appear before Magistrate Judge Laporte on 9/22/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th floor, San Francisco, California. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 22, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2015 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Zwaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James E. Zwaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?