RPM Mortgage, Inc. v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: RPM Mortgage, Inc.
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2015cv03380
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING OSC. Dismissal or Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/4/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 29, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/12/2015 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/29/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
August 20, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Parties shall engage in limited discovery regarding NL and RPMs relationship, to be completed by October 15, 2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RPM Mortgage, Inc. v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RPM Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: David Evan Harris
Represented By: Sara Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Hassan Elrakabawy
Represented By: Evan B Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?