DHC USA Incorporated et al v. La Serene Global et al

Plaintiff: DHC USA Incorporated and DHC Corporation
Defendant: La Serene Global and Tracey Tse
Case Number: 3:2015cv03391
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS DHC USA INCORPORATED AND DHC CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY SIXTY DAYS. Granting 27 . Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
October 13, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 25 Ex Parte Application re 11 Clerk's Notice, Ex Parte Application to Continue the Case Management Conference by Ninety ( 90) Days filed by DHC USA Incorporated, DHC Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/13/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 6, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Discovery.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
August 12, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/2012. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DHC USA Incorporated et al v. La Serene Global et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHC USA Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Nathan Phillips
Represented By: Dominique Heller Pietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHC Corporation
Represented By: Robert Nathan Phillips
Represented By: Dominique Heller Pietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Serene Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Tse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?