Incline Energy LLC v. Weiner et al

Plaintiff: Incline Energy LLC
Defendant: Steven L. Weiner, Kathy Weiner and Product Innovations LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03411
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/15/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
November 24, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 20, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 4, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF GOOD CAUSE AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 20 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2015. Case Management Conference continued to 12/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/4/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Incline Energy LLC v. Weiner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incline Energy LLC
Represented By: Hugo Nicolas Torbet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Product Innovations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?