Markette v. XOMA Corp et al
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Markette
Defendant: John W. Varian, Paul D. Rubin and XOMA Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03425
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 114 Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 94 MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Directing Supplemental Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 96 Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Defendants' 94 Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint to December 15, 2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Sherief Morsy. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 81 Motion to Appear by Telephone at May 24, 2016 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 78 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the May 24, 2016 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL; SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (granting 11 ; denying 12 , 17 and 22 )(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER OF RECUSAL Re 3:15-cv-05236-HSG AND ORDER RESCINDING RELATED CASE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/13/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER OF RECUSAL RE CASE NO. 15-cv-5429-HSG AND ORDER RESCINDING RELATED CASE ORDER RE CASE NOS. 15-cv-3425-HSG and 15-cv-5236-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/24/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 69 Stipulation 66 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 15-5236. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/12/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice For Megan M. Sullivan. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 9 Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Reset All Related Deadlines and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond the Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markette v. XOMA Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Markette
Represented By: Mark Punzalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Varian
Represented By: Brett Hom De Jarnette
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Amanda Alison Main
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Rubin
Represented By: Brett Hom De Jarnette
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Amanda Alison Main
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XOMA Corporation
Represented By: Brett Hom De Jarnette
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Amanda Alison Main
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?