Turner v. Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Adrian Turner
Defendant: Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03495
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMAND CASE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE COUNTY OF ALAMEDA re: 29 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/6/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
December 3, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong denying 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand without Prejudice and Granting Leave to Amend the Putative Class Definition. Signed on 12/01/2015.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
September 15, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2015. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc.
Represented By: Susan E. Bishop
Represented By: Jennifer Yuen-Sea Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Turner
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Douglas Han
Represented By: Jill Jessica Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?