Corcoran et al v. CVS Health Corporation

Plaintiff: Christopher Corcoran, Robert Garber, Toni Odorisio, Robert Guarnieri, Onnolee Samuelson, Ron W. Coder and Irma Pacheco
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03504
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2017 339 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/13/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 12, 2017 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re NOTICE OF ERRATA as to Docket No. 327 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/12/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 5, 2017 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Reply in Support of Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
July 7, 2017 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO CERTAIN DEFENSE REPLY FILINGS re 317 Objection, filed by Onnolee Samuelson, Robert Jenks, Robert Garber, Carl Washington, Debbie Barrett, Zulema Avis, Tyler Clark. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/7/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 15, 2017 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 275 Administrative Motion for Leave to Disclose Two Experts. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
May 15, 2017 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re 268 Letter Brief, filed by Gilbert Brown, Onnolee Samuelson, Toni Odorisio, Christopher Corcoran, Debbie Barrett, Carolyn Caine, Zulema Avis, Robert Garber, Robert Jenks, Zachary Hagert, Carl Washington, Walter Wulff, Vincent Gargiulo, Tyler Clark, Amanda Gilbert, 266 Letter Brief filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
March 21, 2017 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Material Designated Confidential. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
February 23, 2017 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff Elizabeth Gardner re 181 Stipulation filed by Elizabeth Gardner, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Elizabeth Gardner terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/23/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
December 13, 2016 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RECONSIDERING DECEMBER 9 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/13/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 9, 2016 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE re: Dkt. Nos. 187 and 188 . Signed by Judge Magistrate Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/9/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 1, 2016 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Monday, 12/5/2016 08:00 AM. Show Cause Joint Response due by 12:00 noon on Friday, 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/1/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
October 27, 2016 178 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF KEN BOLIN re 177 Stipulation filed by Ken Bolin, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Ken Bolin terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/27/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
September 30, 2016 169 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF ROBERT GUARNIERI re 167 Stipulation filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Robert Guarnieri terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 18, 2016 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ON NATIONWIDE DATA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/18/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
July 29, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Dismiss. (ygrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
June 29, 2016 122 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER [** AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT**] re 120 Stipulation filed by Christopher Corcoran, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
May 13, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
March 14, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 17, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 75 Motion to Continue Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
December 9, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice proposed stipulated Protective Order re 59 Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
October 28, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER (MDL No. 2675): that plaintiffs' motion for transfer under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 is DEEMED WITHDRAWN. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 15, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 39 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; RE-SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY; SETTING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Opposition due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
August 28, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/28/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corcoran et al v. CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Corcoran
Represented By: Rebecca Ruby Anzidei
Represented By: Kristen Ward Broz
Represented By: Pasquale A Cipollone
Represented By: Pat A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Kristen Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garber
Represented By: Rebecca Ruby Anzidei
Represented By: Kristen Ward Broz
Represented By: Pasquale A Cipollone
Represented By: Pat A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Kristen Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Odorisio
Represented By: Rebecca Ruby Anzidei
Represented By: Kristen Ward Broz
Represented By: Pasquale A Cipollone
Represented By: Pat A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Kristen Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Guarnieri
Represented By: Rebecca Ruby Anzidei
Represented By: Kristen Ward Broz
Represented By: Pasquale A Cipollone
Represented By: Pat A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Kristen Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onnolee Samuelson
Represented By: Rebecca Ruby Anzidei
Represented By: Kristen Ward Broz
Represented By: Pasquale A Cipollone
Represented By: Pat A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Kristen Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron W. Coder
Represented By: Rebecca Ruby Anzidei
Represented By: Kristen Ward Broz
Represented By: Pasquale A Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Kristen Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Pacheco
Represented By: Rebecca Ruby Anzidei
Represented By: Kristen Ward Broz
Represented By: Pasquale A Cipollone
Represented By: Pat A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Kristen Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: David Michael Horniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?