Friend v. Davis

Petitioner: Jack Wayne Friend
Respondent: Ron Davis
Miscellaneous: Habeas Capital Notification
Case Number: 3:2015cv03514
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING RESPONDENTS 47 MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
August 25, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 34 MOTION TO SEAL AND SETTING FURTHER BRIEFING Re Docket No. 47 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
June 13, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re 49 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/13/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 9, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Ashwin Cattamanchi. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
September 7, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. AMENDING DUE DATE OF FINALIZED PETITION. (granting 28 Motion). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
May 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES 22 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/24/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/19/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
March 28, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friend v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jack Wayne Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Davis
Represented By: Gregg Edward Zywicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Capital Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?