National Abortion Federation v. Center for Medical Progress et al
Plaintiff: National Abortion Federation
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman and Biomax Procurement Services, LLC
Undetermined: Steven Cooley, Charles C Johnson and Brentford J. Ferreira
Amicus Curiae: State of Arizona and Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Federation of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv03522
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Set Further Case Management Conference for 4/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 578 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 (Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2019). FTR Time: 2:21-3:16. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 577 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #548 Administrative Motion to Seal for compelling justifications as supported by #551 , #552 declarations. This is a text only entry; there is no document image associated with this order. (wholc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) Modified on 12/3/2018 to correct the document number reference of declarations (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2018 Filing 575 Letter Brief re #569 Letter Brief Joint Letter Re: Discovery Disputes filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #569 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 574 Letter Brief re #569 Letter Brief filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #569 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 573 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #572 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12841992 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Defendants the Center for Medical Progress, BioMax Procurement Services, LLC, and David Daleidens Representation Statement)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick denying #544 , #545 Motions to Dismiss and #546 Motion to Strike. #547 Motion to dissolve, modify, or clarify the Preliminary Injunction is DENIED, without prejudice to defendants seeking expedited relief under Civil Local Rule 7-11 based upon rulings of Judge Hite with respect to use of the Preliminary Injunction materials in the state court proceedings. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 570 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/3/2018, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold, telephone number 218-355-8781. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 10/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2019. (veS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 569 Letter Brief re #560 Order Re: anti-SLAPP Stay filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Related document(s) #560 ) (Jonna, Paul) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 568 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/03/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by National Abortion Federation, for Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold. (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 567 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 3, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, for Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 571 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2018 re #544 , #545 Motions to Dismiss, #547 Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and #546 MOTION to Strike. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Discovery dispute discussed. After meet and confer, if the parties reach agreement on any issues, they shall submit a stipulation by November 14, 2018. If disputes remain, they should be outlined in a joint letter to be submitted by November 14, 2018, to be addressed at the December 11, 2018 case management conference. Total Time in Court: 43 minutes. Court Reporter: Vicki Eastvold. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 566 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Alan Roethlisberger (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 565 REPLY (re #547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #354 Order, Terminate Motions ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 564 REPLY (re #544 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byTroy Newman. (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 563 REPLY (re #546 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Claims for Fraudulent Misrepresentation, Promissory Fraud, Breach of Contracts, and Civil Conspiracy ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 562 REPLY (re #545 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 561 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #354 Order, Terminate Motions ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Foran ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to D. Foran Decl., #3 Exhibit B to D. Foran Decl., #4 Exhibit C to D. Foran Decl., #5 Exhibit D. to D. Foran Decl.)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER ON LETTER REGARDING ANTI-SLAPP STAY re #556 Letter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/12/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 559 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #546 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Claims for Fraudulent Misrepresentation, Promissory Fraud, Breach of Contracts, and Civil Conspiracy) filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 558 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #545 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 557 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #544 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 556 Letter from Defendants CMP, BioMax, David Daleiden re Defendants' anti-SLAPP Discovery Stay. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting #554 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule as to #547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification. Responses due by 9/17/2018. Replies due by 9/24/2018. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/22/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 554 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Foran ISO Stip and Prop Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 553 Declaration of Krista Noah in Support of #552 Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal [with Declarant's Signature] filed byPlanned Parenthood Federation of America. (Related document(s) #552 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 552 Declaration of Krista Noah in Support of #548 Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal filed byPlanned Parenthood Federation of America. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/20/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2018 Filing 551 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of #548 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #548 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 550 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Erik Michael Zimmerman re: Attorney Carly Gammill (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 549 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden re #545 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, #548 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #354 Order, Terminate Motions , #546 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Claims for Fraudulent Misrepresentation, Promissory Fraud, Breach of Contracts, and Civil Conspiracy (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 548 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #354 Order, Terminate Motions , Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Responses due by 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles S. LiMandri in support of Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal, #2 Redacted Declaration of David Daleiden, #3 Declaration of David Daleiden, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Proposed Order)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 547 MOTION Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification re #354 Order, Terminate Motions filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/5/2018. Replies due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Daleiden in support of Motion to Dissolve or Modify the Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Clarification)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 546 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Claims for Fraudulent Misrepresentation, Promissory Fraud, Breach of Contracts, and Civil Conspiracy filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/5/2018. Replies due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Daleiden in support of Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Claims)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 545 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/5/2018. Replies due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 544 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Troy Newman. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/5/2018. Replies due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 543 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/17/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by National Abortion Federation, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 542 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal NAF's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(A)(1) by National Abortion Federation (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 541 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 17, 2018, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (295 in 3:16-cv-00236-WHO) Transcript Order,, ) Redaction Request due 8/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 540 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 7/17/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2018). Deadlines set for answer or preliminary motions and for submission of letter briefs regarding appropriate discovery. FTR Time: 2:16-3:00. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/17/2018) Modified on 7/19/2018 to correct deadline information (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2018 Filing 539 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Mariko Maltzer (Maltzer, Diana) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 538 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 537 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Catherine Wynne Short withdrawing and substituting counsel for Daleiden (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 536 Letter from Derek Foran . (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #534 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by John A. Monaghan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 534 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12364496.) filed by Troy Newman. (Monaghan, John) (Filed on 5/18/2018) Modified on 5/21/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2018 Filing 533 CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER TO EXTEND NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION (NAF)'S DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE STATE SUBPOENAS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #531 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 531 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'S Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER of USCA Petitioner's motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of mandamus petition is granted. Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Accordingly, the petition is denied. as to #496 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER of USCA Appellee's unopposed motion to file portions of the answering brief under seal is granted; as to #492 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira, #497 Amended Notice of Appeal,, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 528 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel Re #527 USCA Mandate (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 527 MANDATE of USCA The judgment of this Court, entered March 29,2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court. FOR THE COURT; as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 526 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel Re #522 U.S. Supreme Court Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 525 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel Re #524 US Supreme Court Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court The petition for writ of certiorari is denied; as to #496 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, #497 Amended Notice of Appeal,, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 523 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #526 FOR THE CORRECTION CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel Re #522 U.S. Supreme Court Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) Modified on 4/3/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied; as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER of USCA Appellants' excerpts of record under seal is granted; as to #492 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira, #497 Amended Notice of Appeal,, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER of USCA Real parties in interest's unopposed motions to extend time to file a response to the February 28,2018 order are granted. The court sua sponte extends the time for the district court to address the petition. The district court's answer is due March 28,2018. FOR THE COURT; as to #496 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER of USCA This petition for a writ of mandamus raises issues that warrant an answer. Accordingly, within 14 days after the date of this order, the real parties in interest shall file an answer. The district court, within 14 days after the date of this order, may address the petition if it so desires; as to #250 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
December 20, 2017 Filing 518 USCA Case Number 17-173313 for #496 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 517 NOTICE by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden re #452 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge Re: Notice to District Court of Filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 516 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by John Joseph Williams, Jr Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Joseph Williams (Williams, John) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 515 NOTICE by Center for Medical Progress, Steven Cooley, David Daleiden, Brentford J. Ferreira re #495 Order, #482 Order, Terminate Motions, #514 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion RE: Proof of Bond to Stay Enforcement of Courts Contempt Sanctions Orders (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 514 Notice of Withdrawal of #498 & #499 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Courts Contempt Sanctions Orders (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017) Modified on 10/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER of USCA The Court today entered the following order: The motion for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record is granted; as to #496 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, #497 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 512 US Supreme Court Case Number 17-482 for #496 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, #497 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 511 REPLY (re #498 MOTION to Stay Contempt and Sanctions ) filed bySteven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 510 REPLY (re #499 MOTION to Stay re #495 Order of Enforcement of the Courts Contempt Sanctions Orders against Defendants David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progress Pending Appeal Without Requirement of a Bond ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 509 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 07/11/2017 before Judge Orrick, re #496 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 11/13/2017. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 508 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 05/25/2017 before Judge Orrick, re #496 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 11/13/2017. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 507 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/25/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 506 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #508) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/25/2017 before Judge James Donato by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/11/2017) Modified on 10/13/2017 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2017 Filing 505 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #509) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/11/2017 before Judge James Donato by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, for Court Reporter Katherine Powell. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 10/11/2017) Modified on 10/13/2017 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2017 Filing 504 CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing as to #498 , #499 Motions to Stay rescheduled for 10/24/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 9, 2017 Filing 503 Supplemental Brief re #502 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Notice of Supplemental Material Filed in Support of NAF's Consolidated Opposition to the Contemnors' Motions to Stay Enforcement of the Court's Civil Contempt Sanctions Pending Appeal filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #502 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 502 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #499 MOTION to Stay re #495 Order of Enforcement of the Courts Contempt Sanctions Orders against Defendants David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progress Pending Appeal Without Requirement of a Bond, #498 MOTION to Stay Contempt and Sanctions ) NAF's Consolidated Opposition to the Contemnors' Motions to Stay Enforcement of the Court's Civil Contempt Sanctions Pending Appeal filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 501 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 07/11/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick, III, (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 500 USCA Case Number 17-16862 for #497 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 499 MOTION to Stay re #495 Order of Enforcement of the Courts Contempt Sanctions Orders against Defendants David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progress Pending Appeal Without Requirement of a Bond filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/6/2017. Replies due by 10/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Daleiden in Support of Motion to Stay Enforcement of the Courts Contempt Orders, #2 Declaration of Paul M. Jonna in Support of Motion to Stay Enforcement of the Courts Contempt Orders, #3 [Prposed Order], #4 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 498 MOTION to Stay Contempt and Sanctions filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/6/2017. Replies due by 10/13/2017. (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 497 AMENDED #492 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira as to #482 Order, Terminate Motions; #495 Order; . Appeal Record due by 10/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order Setting Sanction Amount)(Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 9/15/2017) Modified on 9/18/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2017: #2 USCA NUMBER 17-16862) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2017: #3 SUPREME COURT CASE NUMBER 17-482) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2017 Filing 496 JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Appeal of Order, Terminate Motions #482 , Order #495 (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-11710974.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Seeting Amount of Civil Contempt Sanctions, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Civil Contempt, #3 Exhibit C - Representation Statement)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 9/13/2017) Modified on 9/14/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2017: #4 SUPREME COURT CASE NUMBER 17-482) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2017: #5 USCA NUMBER 17-173313) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER SETTING AMOUNT OF CIVIL CONTEMPT SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 16, 2017 Filing 494 USCA Case Number 17-16622 for #492 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 493 U.S. SUPREME COURT Case Number 17-202 for #492 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 492 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re #482 Order; filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11621893 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order of Civil Contempt)(Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2017) Modified on 8/11/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2017: #3 SUPREME COURT CASE NUMBER 17-202) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2017: #4 USCA NUMBER 17-16622) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2017 Filing 491 Notice of Errata and Correction David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progress's Objections to Plaintiff's re #488 Opposition to Application for Sanctions by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleidan; (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 8/7/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #491 Notice (Other), filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC The Correct E-filing Event is Errata not Notice. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #490 MOTION for Joinder to Objections to Sanctions filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira The Correct E-filing Event is Joinder not Motion for Joinder. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 490 NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DAVID DALEIDEN AND THE CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS'S #488 OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF' APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS; filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 8/4/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2017 Filing 489 Request for Judicial Notice re #488 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byDavid Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #488 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 488 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #485 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents ) filed byDavid Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Short, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Public Filing, #4 Exhibit Sealed Filing)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 486 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #485 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 485 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order Granting NAF's Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Declaration of M. Fowler, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit C-2, #8 Exhibit D)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 484 Declaration of Derek F. Foran In Support of NAF's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Court's Order of Civil Contempt filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED, #48 JOINT MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT - #416 , #437 , #433 , #442 , #462 Motions Seal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 481 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Steven Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Remove Docket #478-2)(Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 480 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/11/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #474 Transcript Order, #475 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2017. (Related documents(s) #474 , #475 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 479 *** SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT #480 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/11/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #474 Transcript Order, #475 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2017. (Related documents(s) #474 , #475 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/14/2017) Modified on 7/14/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2017 Filing 478 Declaration of Steve Cooley filed bySteven Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, *** #2 Exhibit B DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 7/14/2017) Modified on 7/14/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2017 Filing 477 Declaration of Brentford Ferreira filed byBrentford J. Ferreira. (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 476 Declaration of David Daleiden in Support of #473 Show Cause Hearing,,,, Pursuant to Court Order on OSC re Contempt filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Related document(s) #473 ) (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 475 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/11/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by National Abortion Federation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 474 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/11/17 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 12, 2017 Filing 473 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/12/2017. By July 28, 2017, plaintiff shall file a declaration establishing reasonable security costs and attorney's fees incurred related to the Order to Show Cause; defendants may file a response by August 4, 2017. Mr. Daleiden, CMP, Mr. Cooley, and Mr. Ferreira shall each file by Friday, July 14, 2017, a declaration under penalty of perjury certifying that all preliminary injunction materials have been taken down from any YouTube channel. CMP and Mr. Daleiden are ordered to turn over to their civil or criminal defense counsel all Preliminary Injunction materials in their possession, custody and control. Total Time in Court 1 hour, 9 minutes. Court Reporter Name Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys Derek F. Foran, Linda Shostak and Christopher Robinson. Defendant Attorneys Paul M. Jonna, Catherine Short, and Matthew F. Heffron. Attorney for Non-Parties: Matthew Geragos. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2017)
July 11, 2017 Filing 472 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 11, 2017 Filing 471 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of #463 Reply to Opposition/Response, Second Supplemental Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of NAF's Response to Order to Show Cause Re Contempt filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #463 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 11, 2017 Filing 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Administrative Motion to File Exhibit C Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Foran Decl. ISO Admin Motiion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admin Motion, #3 Declaration Sec. Supp. Foran Decl, #4 Exhibit A to Sec. Supp. Foran Decl, #5 Exhibit B to Sec. Supp. Foran Decl., #6 Exhibit (Sealed) C to Sec. Supp. Foran Decl.)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 10, 2017 Filing 469 OBJECTIONS to re #468 Order, Terminate Hearings, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings /Objection to Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief Evidence by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER CONCERNING OSC HEARING - Order to Show Cause Hearing advanced to 7/11/2017 03:00 PM. #461 Motion For Leave to File a Reply granted.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 467 Letter from Matthew J. Geragos . (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 466 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Reply in Support of its Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 465 Letter from Matthew J. Geragos . (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 464 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #461 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION NAF's Administrative Motion For Leave to File a Reply to Responses to Order to Show Cause re Contempt ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 463 REPLY (re #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal ) NAF's Reply in Support of Its Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. F. Foran, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit A to M. Fowler Declaration)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Reply in Support of its Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D.F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Reply - Under Seal, #4 Reply - Public, #5 Declaration of M. Fowler, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B - Under Seal, #8 Exhibit C - Under Seal, #9 Declaration of T. Gannon - Under Seal, #10 of D.F. Foran - Public, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 461 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION NAF's Administrative Motion For Leave to File a Reply to Responses to Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed by National Abortion Federation. Responses due by 7/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D.F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER DENYING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT by Hon. William H. Orrick re #458 Motion to Continue. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
July 3, 2017 Filing 459 Letter from Derek F. Foran to Judge Orrick re Defendants' Request for Continuance of Hearing on the Order to Show Cause Re Contempt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
July 3, 2017 Filing 458 MOTION to Continue filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request)(Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
July 3, 2017 Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jay Geragos (Geragos, Matthew) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 456 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/22/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 27, 2017 Filing 455 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/22/17, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #453 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (Related documents(s) #453 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 27, 2017 Filing 454 CLERK'S NOTICE - Order to Show Cause Hearing reset for 7/11/2017 04:00 PM. David Daleiden, Steve Cooley, and Brentford J. Ferreira are required to appear in person, per #409 Order,. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 453 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/22/2017 before Hon. James Donato by National Abortion Federation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Order re #428 Motion for Disqualification. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/26/2017.
June 26, 2017 Filing 451 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2017. re #428 MOTION to Disqualify Judge William H. Orrick, III filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden Total Time in Court 30 Minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2017)
June 22, 2017 Filing 450 Letter from Life Legal Defense Foundation, Thomas More Society, Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund Requesting a Separate Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Hon. William H. Orrick III. (Jonna, Paul) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 449 REPLY (re #428 MOTION to Disqualify Judge William H. Orrick, III ) filed byCenter for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 18, 2017 Filing 448 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt ) re #433 Adminisitrative Motion to File Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed bySteven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ferreira, Brentford) (Filed on 6/18/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 447 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #428 MOTION to Disqualify Judge William H. Orrick, III ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa Fowler, #2 Declaration of Mario Paz)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #440 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 445 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #440 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Vicki I. Podberesky ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO #440 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR OSC RESPONSE. Plaintiffs' response to the motion to withdraw is due by 10:00 a.m. tomorrow, June 16, 2017. Cooley and Ferreira's response to the OSC is due by June 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/15/2017. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Mayo (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 442 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal declaration in support of motion to withdraw as counsel, filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of administrative motion to file under seal, #2 Proposed Order to file under seal, #3 redacted declaration in support of motion to withdraw, #4 declaration in support of motion to withdraw)(Podberesky, Vicki) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 441 Statement of Non-Opposition to NAFs Administrative Motion to Seal filed byCenter for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 440 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Vicki I. Podberesky filed by Steven Cooley, Brentford J. Ferreira. Responses due by 6/29/2017. Replies due by 7/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Podberesky, Vicki) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 439 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding #438 Notice of Withdrawal. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 11-5(a), Counsel may not withdraw from an action until relieved by order of Court. If Ms. Podberesky wishes to be relieved prior to Judge Donato's ruling on the pending #428 Motion to Disqualify Judge, she may seek the assistance of the Duty Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 438 NOTICE by Steven Cooley and Brentford Ferreira of their attorney's withdrawal as counsel fo record (Podberesky, Vicki) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 12, 2017 Filing 437 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER GRANTING #435 REQUEST FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME. Cooley and Ferreira's response to the OSC is due by June 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/9/2017. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 435 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File request to extend time to file reply to OSC filed by Steven Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order extension of time to file reply)(Podberesky, Vicki) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 434 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt, #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal ) filed byCenter for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles S. LiMandri in support of David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progresss Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt, #2 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles S. LiMandri in support of David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progress Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal, #2 David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progresss Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt, #3 David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progresss Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt-Public, #4 [Proposed] Order on David Daleiden and the Center for Medical Progresss Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal, #5 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER re #428 MOTION to Disqualify Judge. Response due by 6/16/2017. Reply, if any, due by 6/20/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. The Court sets this schedule in light of its upcoming trial calendar and the pending contempt proceedings. All moving papers must conform to Judge Donato's standing orders. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/9/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #428 MOTION to Disqualify Judge William H. Orrick, III filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Signed by Executive Committee on 06/09/2017. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER REGARDING #428 MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION; REFERRING MOTION TO CLERK FOR RANDOM ASSIGMENT. The June 14, 2017 hearing on the Order to Show Cause re Contempt is VACATED, although the briefing schedule remains in place. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/08/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 429 Letter from Derek F. Foran to Judge Orrick re Motion for Disqualification. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 428 MOTION to Disqualify Judge William H. Orrick, III filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/21/2017. Replies due by 6/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Disqualification of Hon William H Orrick, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Counsel in Support of Motion for Disqualification of Hon William H Orrick)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 6/7/2017) Modified on 6/8/2017 to restrict Dkt. 428-1 to applicable case participants. (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part #425 Administrative Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendants' response to the OSC must be filed on or before Friday June 9, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER.(wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 426 Letter from Derek F. Foran to Judge Orrick. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 425 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Enlargement of time to file a response to the Order to Show Cause re Contempt re #409 Order to Show Cause, filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Responses due by 6/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Trissell in Support of Administrative Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause re Contempt, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME re #421 Letter. Cooley and Ferreria's response to the OSC shall be filed on or before 12:00 p.m. Monday June 12, 2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/06/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 423 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 422 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 421 Letter from Vicki I. Podberesky requesting additional time to file a Reply. . (Podberesky, Vicki) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 420 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki I. Podberesky as to Steve Cooley and Brentford J. Ferreira (Podberesky, Vicki) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 419 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #417 Response to Order to Show Cause, (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER RE SERVICE OF OSC/COMTEMPT PLEADINGS re #415 Letter filed by National Abortion Federation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/02/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 417 RESPONSE TO #409 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; by National Abortion Federation NAF's Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Foran, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Q, #7 Exhibit R, #8 Exhibit S, #9 Exhibit T, #10 Exhibit U, #11 Exhibit W, #12 Exhibit X, #13 Exhibit AA, #14 Exhibit BB)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/1/2017) Modified on 6/2/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2017 Filing 416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NAF's Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Response to OSC, #4 Declaration of Gannon, #5 Declaration of Fowler, #6 Declaration of D. Foran ISO OSC, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 415 Letter from D. Foran . (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Order Regarding Briefing Schedule by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #412 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 413 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/25/2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045. email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 4:08 p.m. - 4:28 p.m. = 20 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #411 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2017. (Related documents(s) #411 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 412 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/25/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by National Abortion Federation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 410 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 5/25/2017. FTR Time 4:08-4:28. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/25/2017) Modified on 5/26/2017: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT - Hearing set for 6/14/2017 02:00 PM. Plaintiffs' response in support of contempt allegations shall be filed by May 31, 2017. Defense and Criminal Counsel Responses due by 6/7/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/25/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 408 CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephone conference set for 5/25/2017 04:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER of USCA Appellants' unopposed motion to stay the mandate is granted; as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER of USCA The petition for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc, is DENIED; as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Order to Extend National Abortion Federation's Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #404 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 20, 2017 Filing 404 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 12, 2017 Filing 403 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Trissell as Counsel for Defendants Center for Medical Progress & BioMax Procurement Services (Trissell, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 12, 2017 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michael Jonna as Counsel for Defendants Center for Medical Progress & BioMax Procurement Services (Jonna, Paul) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 4, 2017 Filing 401 USCA Memorandum: AFFIRMED; as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Dissent)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 400 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Nicholas Scott Napolitan (Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #398 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 28, 2017 Filing 398 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
February 14, 2017 Filing 397 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel & [PROPOSED] ORDER; by Charles Salvatore LiMandri (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 2/14/2017) Modified on 2/15/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2016 Filing 396 Letter from Derek F. Foran . (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 395 Letter from Catherine Short . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 394 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 9, 2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #393 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2017. (Related documents(s) #393 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 393 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/09/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by National Abortion Federation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 392 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2016 regarding subpoena served on the Center for Medical Progress by the Select Investigative Panel of the Congressional Committee on Energy and Commerce. The Court requests that the minority members provide any information to the Court by Monday, November 14, 2016.The stay issued by the Court on November 4, 2016 (Dkt. No. #390 ) remains in place until a further written order of the Court. FTR Time 4:01-4:25. Plaintiff Attorney Derek Foran. Defendant Attorneys Katherine Short, Edward L. White, and Steven Wood. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2016) Modified on 11/10/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2016 Filing 391 Letter from Catherine Short . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 390 Letter Brief filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 389 Letter from Derek Foran . (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 388 Letter from Catherine Short re congressional subpoena. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER PRESERVING STATUS QUO AND SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE - Telephone Conference set for 11/9/2016 04:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. If they wish to, defendants and plaintiffs may file a two page brief by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday November 8, 2016, focused on defendants' intention to produce to Congress discovery covered by the Protective Order in this case. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/4/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 386 Letter from Catherine Short . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit subpoena)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 385 Letter from Derek F. Foran . (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 26, 2016 Filing 384 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lawrence Javier Serrano Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of L. Javier Serrano (Serrano, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER of USCA Appellants' motion to Close Portions of Oral Argument is granted; as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER TO EXTEND NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION (NAF)'S DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE STATE SUBPOENAS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #381 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 381 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 380 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Corrine Gura Konczal (Konczal, Corrine) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE STATE SUBPOENAS re #371 STIPULATION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/15/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 14, 2016 Filing 379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2016. FTR Time 3:33-3:37. Plaintiff Attorneys Derek Foran, Javier Serrano, and Nicholas Napolitan. Defendants' Attorneys Edward L. White, III, Catherine Wynne Short, and Peter Breen. Counsel for State of Arizona: Beau Roysden. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/14/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER of USCA This is a preliminary injunction appeal; as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER regarding #371 STIPULATION to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF's) Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas. NAF may have until JUNE 20, 2016 to either (1) complete its meet-and-confer discussions with the Arizona Attorney General and/or the Louisiana Inspector General or (2) initiate litigation concerning the subpoenas Telephone Conference set for 6/14/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Counsel wishing to participate in the telephone conference should make arrangements to do so with the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 373 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Corrine L Purvis Withdrawal (Purvis, Corrine) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 372 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by James Bopp, Jr Withdrawal (Bopp, James) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 371 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF's) Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #368 Stipulation to Extend National Abortion Federation's Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 19, 2016 Filing 369 ***PLEASE DISREGARD; SEE #370 ORDER*** Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #368 Stipulation to Extend National Abortion Federation's Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016) Modified on 4/19/2016 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2016 Filing 368 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #366 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Matthew F. Heffron. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 18, 2016 Filing 366 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Heffron ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10379841.) filed by David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Nebraska), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Iowa))(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #364 Stipulation to Extend NAF's Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 364 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 363 USCA Case Number 16-15360 for #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 362 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 12/18/2015 before Judge WHO, (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 361 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. Appeal of Order, Terminate Motions #354 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10266428 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(White, Edward) (Filed on 3/5/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2016: #2 USCA Number: 16-15360) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #359 Stipulation to Extend National Abortion Federation's Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 359 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #357 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 357 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY TRIAL COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING DEFENDANTS' APPEAL OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER RE SECOND MOTION TO QUASH by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #230 Motion to Quash. Mr. Johnson's motion to quash is GRANTED without prejudice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick granting #58 , #60 , #71 , #87 , #255 , #262 , #265 , #266 , #267 , #279 , #288 , #292 , #308 , and #323 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING #225 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 3, 2016 Filing 353 EXHIBITS re #352 MOTION for Leave to File 2d supplement to Preliminary Injunction record Ex.A to the Declaration of Catherine Short filed byDavid Daleiden. (Related document(s) #352 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Filing 352 SECOND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RECORD; filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Short, #2 Proposed Order)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 2/3/2016) Modified on 2/4/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2016 Filing 351 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER DENYING #341 MOTION TO MODIFY TRO by Judge William H. Orrick. #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal granted. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 348 RESPONSE (re #341 MOTION to Modify TRO to Allow Specified Recordings to be Filed as Part of Amicus Brief ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Sealed Opposition to Deft. D. Daleiden and Center for Medical Progress's Motion to Modify TRO to Allow Specified Recordings to be Filed As Part of Amicus Brief, #4 Declaration Sealed Declaration of Derek F. Foran Opposition to Deft. D. Daleiden and Center for Medical Progress's Motion to Modify TRO to Allow Specified Recordings to be Filed As Part of Amicus Brief, #5 Public Opposition to Deft. D. Daleiden and Center for Medical Progress's Motion to Modify TRO to Allow Specified Recordings to be Filed As Part of Amicus Brief, #6 Declaration Public Declaration of Derek F. Foran Opposition to Deft. D. Daleiden and Center for Medical Progress's Motion to Modify TRO to Allow Specified Recordings to be Filed As Part of Amicus Brief)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 346 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Preliminary Injunction Record filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of NAF's Administrative Motion to Supplement the Preliminary Injunction Record, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 345 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #346 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran In Support of NAF's Administrative Motion to Supplement The Preliminary Injunction Record, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/26/2016) Modified on 1/27/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress of Change in CMP's Board Membership (Wood, Steven) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #342 MOTION to Shorten Time for briefing as to #341 MOTION to Modify TRO to Allow Specified Recordings to be Filed as Part of Amicus Brief. Responses due by 1/26/2016. No reply shall be filed. No hearing shall be conducted unless noticed separately. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 to reflect that the order was not stipulated. (jmdS, OURT STAFF).
January 22, 2016 Filing 342 MOTION to Shorten Time for briefing Motion to Modify filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Wood, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 341 MOTION to Modify TRO to Allow Specified Recordings to be Filed as Part of Amicus Brief filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Responses due by 2/5/2016. Replies due by 2/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Short, #2 Proposed Order)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 340 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal docs relating to Motion to Modify filed by Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Short, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion to Modify-Public Version, #4 Motion to Modify (to be filed under seal))(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 3:16cv236-KAW is related and will be reassigned. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #336 Response ( Non Motion ) to Judicial Referral (Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 20, 2016 Filing 337 RESPONSE to re #333 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc., Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest, Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, Planned Parenthood/Orange and San Bernardino Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood of Santa Barbara, Ventura and San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood: Shasta-Diablo, Inc. dba Planned Parenthood Northern California, Planned Parenthood Pasadena and San Gabriel Valley, Inc.. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 Filing 336 RESPONSE to re #333 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden re #334 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declarations by Daleiden, CMP, and BioMax (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 334 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #325 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declarations by Daleiden, CMP, and BioMax by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (part 2 of 2))(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 333 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 16-cv-236. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/15/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #329 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 331 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Troy Newman re #330 Document E-Filed Under Seal (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 330 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #325 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of 10 individuals)(Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 329 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #325 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, NAF's Omnibus of Declarations in Response to the Court's Order of December 30, 2015 by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 13, 2016 Filing 328 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 12, 2016 Filing 327 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #325 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Brian Chavez-Ochoa pursuant to Order dated December 30, 2015 by Troy Newman. (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #324 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 11, 2016 Filing 324 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 11, 2016 Filing 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter re: TRO Materials filed by David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Short, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Letter to be filed under seal, #4 Exh A to be filed under seal, #5 Letter, public version, #6 Exh A, public version)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 9, 2016 Filing 322 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Preliminary Injunction Record filed by David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/9/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 321 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by David Daleiden for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER RE TRANSCRIPTS - Granting Permission to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/30/2015. (This document replaces #318 Order, using a different filing event to facilitate the parties' filing of the declarations using the "Document E-filed Under Seal" event.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 30, 2015 Filing 320 AMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Steven Wood, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/30/2015) Modified on 1/4/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2015 Filing 319 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 23, 2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #312 Transcript Order, #313 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/29/2016. (Related documents(s) #312 , #313 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ***REPLACED BY #325 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal***ORDER RE DECLARATIONS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/30/201. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015) Modified on 1/12/2016 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2015 Filing 317 Letter from Peter Breen, on behalf of Defendants Daleiden, CMP, & BioMax . (Breen, Peter) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 28, 2015 Filing 316 Letter from Derek F. Foran, Attorney for National Abortion Federation . (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 28, 2015 Filing 315 Letter from Vladimir F. Kozina, Attorney for Troy Newman . (Kozina, Vladimir) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 314 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/23/2015 re #193 MOTION to Quash. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorneys Nick Napolitan and Derek Foran. Defendant Attorneys Christopher Schweickert, Peter Breen, Vladimir Kozina, and Ed White. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 313 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (White, Edward) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 312 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 22, 2015 Filing 311 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 18, 2015, (corrected appearances), before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #306 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Documents 226-22 and 28-35 shall remain sealed from public access. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 308 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas S. Napolitan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Highlighted Exhibit 62, #4 Redacted Exhibit 62)(Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 307 *** SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT #311 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on December 18, 2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #303 Transcript Order, #304 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (Related documents(s) #303 , #304 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/21/2015) Modified on 12/22/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2015 Filing 306 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (White, Edward) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 310 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2015 re #225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #230 Second MOTION to Quash. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. FTR Time 9:06-10:48. Plaintiff Attorneys Linda Shostak, Derek Foran, Christopher Robertson, and Nicholas Napolitan. Defendant Attorneys Erik M. Zimmerman, Edward L. White, Catherine Short, Peter Breen, and Steven H. Wood. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 304 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by David Daleiden for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 303 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #300 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 301 OBJECTIONS to re #293 Reply to Opposition/Response Def's Evidentiary Objections to Pl's Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 300 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 299 Declaration of Steven Wood in Support of #288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCenter for Medical Progress. (Related document(s) #288 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 298 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Response or Alternatively, for Order Waiving Defect filed by David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 297 Declaration of Steven Wood in Support of #292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Pl.'s Reply in support of Mot. for Preliminary Injunction filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress. (Related document(s) #292 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 296 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 295 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of #225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AMENDED DECLARATION OF DEREK F. FORAN IN SUPPORT OF NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION (NAF)'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [DKT. 228-6] filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 294 Declaration of DEREK F. FORAN in Support of #293 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 134, #3 Exhibit 135, #4 Exhibit 136, #5 Exhibit 137, #6 Exhibit 138, #7 Exhibit 139, #8 Exhibit 140, #9 Exhibit 141, #10 Exhibit 142, #11 Exhibit 143, #12 Exhibit 144, #13 Exhibit 145, #14 Exhibit 146, #15 Exhibit 147, #16 Exhibit 148, #17 Exhibit 149)(Related document(s) #293 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 293 REPLY (re #225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION (NAF)'S REPLY INSUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] NAF's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Prelmininary Injunction, #4 [Unredacted] NAF's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Prelmininary Injunction, #5 [Redacted] Rebuttal Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of NAF's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Prelmininary Injunction, #6 [Unredacted] Rebuttal Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of NAF's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Prelmininary Injunction, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit 135, #8 [Unredacted] Exhibit 137, #9 [Unredacted] Exhibit 138, #10 [Unredacted] Exhibit 139, #11 [Redacted] Amended Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #12 [Unredacted] Amended Declaration of Derek F. Foran)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Docket Nos. 288.4, 288.6, and 288.7) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 290 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of #222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis") Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Public/Redacted Version) Amended Declaration of Derek F. Foran (Public/Redacted Version) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #222 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 289 REPLY (re #222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis") Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Public/Redacted Version) ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Derek F. Foran, #2 Exhibit 1 (document to be filed under seal))(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 NAF's Reply in Support of Motion for OSC (Docket No. 221)(Public/Redacted Version), #4 NAF's Reply in Support of Motion for OSC (Docket No. 221)(To be Filed Under Seal/Highlighted Version), #5 Amended Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of NAF's Motion for OSC (Docket No. 221)(Public/Redacted Version), #6 Amended Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of NAF's Motion for OSC (Docket No. 221)(To be Filed Under Seal/Highlighted Version), #7 Exhibit 1 (to the Rebuttal Declaration of Derek F. Foran)(To be Filed Under Seal))(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 287 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/23/2015. Replies due by 12/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Previously Filed Amicus Brief)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON DECEMBER 18, 2015 as to #222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and #225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 advanced to 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/9/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 285 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Maria Mazzeo Syms on behalf of State of Arizona. (Syms, Maria) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER of USCA The Center has also filed a motion to stay discovery pending appeal of the district court's discovery order and pending our ruling on the petition for a writ of mandamus. Because we deny the petition for a writ of mandamus, we dismiss the motion to stay pending the disposition as moot. For the reasons discussed in this order, the Center is unlikely to succeed in its appeal. Accordingly, we deny that motion as well. Re #121 Notice. USCA NUMBERS 15-17317 & 15-173618 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER of USCA Petitioners-Appellants' emergency motion for a temporary stay is denied. Re #121 Notice (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 282 REPLY (re #230 Second MOTION to Quash ) filed byCharles C Johnson. (Meuser, Mark) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 281 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of #265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #265 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 280 REPLY (re #230 Second MOTION to Quash ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Short in Support, #2 Evidentiary Objections)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Def's Reply re: Johnson's 2d Mot to Quash filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Short, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Reply brief (redacted version), #4 Reply Brief (unredacted version))(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 278 AMENDED #277 Declaration of Catherine Short In Support of Administrative #255 Motion to Seal Documents re Plaintiff's Opposition to Johnson's Motion to Quash filed byDavid Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Filing 277 Declaration of Catherine Short in Support of Adminstrative Motion to Seal [Doc #255 ] filed byDavid Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #271 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. The Clerk shall seal Docket Nos. 262-3, 263, 265-2, 265-4, 265-8, 268, 268-1, 268-2.(wholc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #264 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. The Clerk shall seal this incorrectly filed document (263-6).(wholc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 276 EXHIBITS re #262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Def's Opposition to Pl.'s Motion for Rule to Show Cause Corrected redacted version of Dkt#262-3, Brief filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Related document(s) #262 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 275 EXHIBITS re #265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion Corrected redacted version of Dkt#265-8, Evidentiary Objections filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Related document(s) #265 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 274 EXHIBITS re #265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion Corrected redacted version of Dkt#265-2 Brief filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Related document(s) #265 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 273 EXHIBITS re #265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion Corrected redacted version of Dkt#265-3, Declaration of Daleiden filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Related document(s) #265 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 272 EXHIBITS re #268 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Additional Exhibits to Defs.' Opp. to Pl.'s Mot. for Preliminary Injunction filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 34, part 1, #2 Ex. 34, part 2, #3 Ex. 34, part 3, #4 Ex 35 part 1, #5 Ex 35 part 2, #6 Ex 35 part 3, #7 Ex 35 part 4, #8 Ex 35 part 5, #9 Ex 35 part 6, #10 Ex 35 part 7, #11 Ex 35 part 8, #12 Ex 35 part 9, #13 Ex 35 part 10, #14 Ex 35 part 11, #15 Ex 35 part 12, #16 Ex 35 part 13, #17 Ex 35 part 14, #18 Ex 35 part 15, #19 Ex 37, #20 Ex 39, #21 Ex 44)(Related document(s) #268 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 271 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document relating to docket numbers 262-268 filed by David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 270 EXHIBITS re #267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Third set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion, #265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion, #266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion Exhibits 3 and 5 of Opposition filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 3, part 2, #2 Exhibit Exh 5, #3 Exhibit Redacted version of 3 & 5)(Related document(s) #267 , #265 , #266 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 269 Brief re #222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis") Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Public/Redacted Version) Evidentiary Objections to Pl.'s Motion filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Related document(s) #222 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 268 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** RESPONSE (re #225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) Opposition by All Defs to Pl's Mot for Preliminary Injunction filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections, #2 Declaration of David Daleiden, #3 Exhibit to Decl. of Daleiden, #4 Declaration of Corrine Konczal, #5 Exhibit 3-29 (all filed under seal), #6 Ex 30, #7 ex 31, #8 ex 32, #9 ex 33, #10 ex 36, #11 ex 40, #12 ex 41, #13 ex 42, #14 ex 43)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/3/2015) Modified on 12/4/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2015 Filing 267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Third set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Ex. 20, #2 Unredacted Ex. 21, #3 Unredacted Ex. 22, #4 Unredacted Ex. 23, #5 Unredacted Ex. 24, #6 Unredacted Ex. 25, #7 Unredacted Ex. 26, #8 Unredacted Ex. 27, #9 Unredacted Ex. 28, #10 Unredacted Ex. 29, #11 Unredacted Ex. 45, #12 Unredacted Ex. 46, #13 Unredacted Ex. 47, #14 Unredacted Ex. 48, #15 Unredacted Ex. 49)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Ex. 4, #2 Unredacted Ex. 6, #3 Unredacted Ex. 8, #4 Unredacted Ex.9, #5 Unredacted Ex.10, #6 Unredacted Ex.11, #7 Unredacted Ex.12, #8 Unredacted Ex.13, #9 Unredacted Ex.14, #10 Unredacted Ex.15, #11 Unredacted Ex.16, #12 Unredacted Ex.17, #13 Unredacted Ex.18, #14 Unredacted Ex.19, #15 Unredacted Ex.20)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 265 *** ATTACHMENTS 2, 4, 8 LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First set of Docs in Opp to Pl.'s PI Motion filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Brief (unredacted), #2 brief (redacted), #3 Declaration of Daleiden (unredacted), #4 Declaration of Daleiden (redacted), #5 Declaration of Catherine Short in support of Admin Mot, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Evidentiary objections (unredacted), #8 Evidentiary objections (redacted))(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/3/2015) Modified on 12/4/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2015 Filing 264 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket No. 263-6 filed by David Daleiden. (Breen, Peter) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 263 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** RESPONSE (re #222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis") Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Public/Redacted Version) ) Brief in Opposition filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Daleiden, #2 Declaration of Peter Breen, #3 Declaration of Corrine Konczal, #4 Exhibit A to Konczal Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Konczal Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Konczal Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Konczal Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Konczal Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Konczal Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Konczal Decl., #11 Exhibit H to Konczal Decl., #12 Exhibit I to Konczal Decl.)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/3/2015) Modified on 12/4/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2015 Filing 262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Def's Opposition to Pl.'s Motion for Rule to Show Cause filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Catherine Short, *** #3 brief (redacted) DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #4 brief (unredacted, to be sealed))(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 12/3/2015) Modified on 12/4/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #260 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 260 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for Leave to File Excess Pages for Joint Response to Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erik Zimmerman)(Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 12/1/2015) Modified on 12/2/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2015 Filing 259 EXHIBITS re #256 Opposition/Response to Motion, Corrected Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Derek F. Foran In Support of Naf's Opposition to Charles Johnson's Second Motion to Quash filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #256 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 257 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 256 RESPONSE (re #230 Second MOTION to Quash ) NAF's Opposition to Second Motion to Quash The Subpoena of Charles C. Johnson (DKT. 230) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10See Docket Number #259 for the Attachment to Exhibit 9 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/30/2015) Modified on 12/2/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2015 Filing 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) NAF's Opposition to Second Motion to Quash The Subpoena of Charles C. Johnson (Dkt. 230), #4 (Sealed) NAF's Opposition to Second Motion to Quash The Subpoena of Charles C. Johnson (Dkt. 230), #5 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 254 USCA Case Number 15-17318 for #250 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Medical Progress, Troy Newman, David Daleiden, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #246 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER ON CONTESTED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick re #228 and #234 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 250 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re #185 Order & #244 Order; filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10022669 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Bopp, James) (Filed on 11/25/2015) Modified on 11/30/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2015: #2 USCA Number: 15-17318) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #232 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James Bopp, Jr. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 246 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend NAF's Deadline to Challenge State Subpoenas filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #237 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Corrine Purvis. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY, CERTIFY OR RECONSIDER AND DEFENDANTS' INVOCATION OF THE FIFTH AMENDMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick re #206 Motion to Stay. Absent a stay imposed by the Ninth Circuit, within 14 days of the date of this Order defendants shall disclose to NAF as "Attorneys Eyes Only" the identity of the recipients of NAF's confidential information and disclose unredacted documents regarding the same. Defendant CMP shall also, within 14 days of the date of this Order, produce the contracts with its independent contractors, as well as communications with them regarding the project. Finally, defendant Daleidin shall, within 14 days of the date of this Order, provide a supplemental interrogatory response identifying the independent contractors who attended NAF meetings at his direction. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 243 Declaration of Derek Foran CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [ #242 -1] filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/20/2015) Modified on 11/23/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2015 Filing 242 REPLY (re #234 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Please See Docket Number #243 for the Correct Attachment Declaration Derek Foran, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/20/2015) Modified on 11/23/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #239 STIPULATION to adjust briefing schedule re #222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 12/3/2015. Replies due by 12/10/2015.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/20/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Manual Filing Notification of Excerpted Video & Audio Clips Cited as Exhibit 1 to The Appendix in Support of NAF's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. N. 228-7), #4 Cover Letter, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 239 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis") Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Public/Redacted Version) Joint Stipulation to Align Briefing Schedules filed by David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 238 RESPONSE (re #234 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byDavid Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Short, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 237 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Corrine L. Purvis ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10005638.) filed by Center for Medical Progress. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Purvis, Corrine) (Filed on 11/19/2015) Modified on 11/20/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER RESTRICTING ACCESS TO INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS: DOCKET NOS. 225 AND 228-3 by Hon. William H. Orrick re #233 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 235 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 234 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Public/Redacted), #4 National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction (To be Filed Under Seal/Highlighted))(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 233 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket Nos. 225 and 228-3 filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 232 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Bopp, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10002157.) filed by Center for Medical Progress. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Bopp, James) (Filed on 11/18/2015) Modified on 11/19/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2015 Filing 231 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #228 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 377 EXHIBIT 70: COMPACT DISC; re #226 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION & re #226 Part 30 Notice of Manual Filing; filed byNational Abortion Federation. PER CHAMBERS (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) This is a Text Only Docket Entry
November 16, 2015 Filing 376 EXHIBIT 15: COMPACT DISC ; re #225 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SUMMARY INJUNCTION & #225 Part 18 Notice of Manual Filing ; filed byNational Abortion Federation. PER CHAMBERS (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) This is a Text Only Docket Entry
November 15, 2015 Filing 230 Second MOTION to Quash filed by Charles C Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/30/2015. Replies due by 12/7/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Meuser, #2 Proposed Order)(Meuser, Mark) (Filed on 11/15/2015)
November 15, 2015 Filing 229 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles C Johnson (Meuser, Mark) (Filed on 11/15/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 228 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Sealed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Redacted Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #6 Sealed Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #7 Manual Filing Notice Exhibit 1 Submitted Under Seal, #8 Sealed Exhibit 26, #9 Sealed Exhibit 27, #10 Sealed Exhibit 28, #11 Sealed Exhibit 29, #12 Sealed Exhibit 30, #13 Sealed Exhibit 31, #14 Sealed Exhibit 32, #15 Sealed Exhibit 33, #16 Sealed Exhibit 34, #17 Sealed Exhibit 35, #18 Sealed Exhibit 36, #19 Sealed Exhibit 37, #20 Sealed Exhibit 38, #21 Sealed Exhibit 42, #22 Sealed Exhibit 43, #23 Sealed Exhibit 44, #24 Sealed Exhibit 45, #25 Sealed Exhibit 46, #26 Sealed Exhibit 47, #27 Sealed Exhibit 56, #28 Sealed Exhibit 57, #29 Redacted Exhibit 59, #30 Sealed Exhibit 59, #31 Redacted Exhibit 60, #32 Sealed Exhibit 60, #33 Redacted Exhibit 61, #34 Sealed Exhibit 61, #35 Redacted Exhibit 62, #36 Sealed Exhibit 62, #37 Sealed Exhibit 63, #38 Redacted Exhibit 64, #39 Sealed Exhibit 64, #40 Redacted Exhibit 65, #41 Sealed Exhibit 65, #42 Sealed Exhibit 92, #43 Sealed Exhibit 93, #44 Sealed Exhibit 95, #45 Sealed Exhibit 101, #46 Sealed Exhibit 105, #47 Sealed Exhibit 127)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 227 EXHIBITS re #225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Exhibit 91 filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92, #2 Exhibit 93, #3 Exhibit 94, #4 Exhibit 95, #5 Exhibit 96, #6 Exhibit 97, #7 Exhibit 98, #8 Exhibit 99, #9 Exhibit 100, #10 Exhibit 101, #11 Exhibit 102, #12 Exhibit 103, #13 Exhibit 104, #14 Exhibit 105, #15 Exhibit 106, #16 Exhibit 107, #17 Exhibit 108, #18 Exhibit 109, #19 Exhibit 110, #20 Exhibit 111, #21 Exhibit 112, #22 Exhibit 113, #23 Exhibit 114, #24 Exhibit 115, #25 Exhibit 116, #26 Exhibit 117, #27 Exhibit 118, #28 Exhibit 119, #29 Exhibit 120, #30 Exhibit 121, #31 Exhibit 122, #32 Exhibit 123, #33 Exhibit 124, #34 Exhibit 125, #35 Exhibit 126, #36 Exhibit 127, #37 Exhibit 128, #38 Exhibit 129, #39 Exhibit 130, #40 Exhibit 131, #41 Exhibit 132, #42 Exhibit 133)(Related document(s) #225 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 226 EXHIBITS re #225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Exhibit 41 filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 43, #3 Exhibit 44, #4 Exhibit 45, #5 Exhibit 46, #6 Exhibit 47, #7 Exhibit 48, #8 Exhibit 49, #9 Exhibit 50, #10 Exhibit 51, #11 Exhibit 52, #12 Exhibit 53, #13 Exhibit 54, #14 Exhibit 55-A, #15 Exhibit 55-B, #16 Exhibit 56, #17 Exhibit 57, #18 Exhibit 58, #19 Exhibit 59, #20 Exhibit 60, #21 Exhibit 61, #22 Exhibit 62, #23 Exhibit 63, #24 Exhibit 64, #25 Exhibit 65, #26 Exhibit 66, #27 Exhibit 67, #28 Exhibit 68, #29 Exhibit 69, #30 Manual Filing Notice Ex. 70, #31 Exhibit 71, #32 Exhibit 72, #33 Exhibit 73, #34 Exhibit 74, #35 Exhibit 75, #36 Exhibit 76, #37 Exhibit 77, #38 Exhibit 78, #39 Exhibit 79, #40 Exhibit 80, #41 Exhibit 81-A, #42 Exhibit 81-B, #43 Exhibit 82, #44 Exhibit 83, #45 Exhibit 84, #46 Exhibit 85, #47 Exhibit 86, #48 Exhibit 87, #49 Exhibit 88, #50 Exhibit 89, #51 Exhibit 90)(Related document(s) #225 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 225 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR .LOCK REQUESTED BY FILER . *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Abortion Federation. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/3/2015. Replies due by 12/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Appendix, #4 Manual Filing Notice Ex. 1 Submitted Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Manual Filing Notice Ex. 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Manual Filing Notice Ex. 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2015) Modified on 11/18/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER CLARIFYING FILING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #219 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation concerning service of NAF's Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why The Center For Medical Progress And David Daleiden (aka Robert Sarkis) Should Not Be Held In Contempt (To Be Filed Under Seal/Highlighted Version), Docket No. 221 (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis") Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Public/Redacted Version) filed by National Abortion Federation. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/27/2015. Replies due by 12/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of NAF's Motion For An Order To Show Cause (Public/Redacted Version), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 National Abortion Federation (Naf)S Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why The Center For Medical Progress And David Daleiden (Aka Robert Sarkis) Should Not Be Held In Contempt (Public-Redacted Version), #4 National Abortion Federation (Naf)S Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why The Center For Medical Progress And David Daleiden (Aka Robert Sarkis) Should Not Be Held In Contempt (To be Filed Under Seal/Highlighted Version, #5 Declaration of Derek Foran in Support of NAF's Motion For An Order To Show Cause (Public/Redacted Version), #6 Declaration of Derek Foran in Support of NAF's Motion For An Order To Show Cause (To be Filed Under Seal/Highlighted Version))(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER REGARDING SCOPE OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #215 Stipulation. #210 Motion withdrawn. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 11, 2015 Filing 219 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re responsive pleading filed by David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION (NAF)'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING CMP/BIOMAX'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION (NAF)'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 215 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Scope of Protective Order filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #209 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Opposition and Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 213 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 212 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress re #205 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Doc. 207-4 (Schweickert, Christopher) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 211 REPLY (re #205 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #206 Joint MOTION to Stay re #179 Brief, #185 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motion to Stay, Certify, or Alternatively Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Schweickert, Christopher) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 210 MOTION Administrative Motion Regarding Protective Order and Meet & Confer with Government Entities filed by National Abortion Federation. Responses due by 11/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Foran, #2 Proposed Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re modification of briefing schedule filed by David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 208 RESPONSE (re #206 Joint MOTION to Stay re #179 Brief, #185 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motion to Stay, Certify, or Alternatively Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) NAF's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Conditional Certification of Interlocutory Appeal of This Court's Order Overruling Defendants' Claim of First Amendment Privilege, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted NAF's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Conditional Certification of Interlocutory Appeal of This Court's Order Overruling Defendants' Claim of First Amendment Privilege, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #4 Sealed NAF's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Conditional Certification of Interlocutory Appeal of This Court's Order Overruling Defendants' Claim of First Amendment Privilege, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #5 Redacted Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #6 Sealed Declaration of Derek F. Foran)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 206 Joint MOTION to Stay re #179 Brief, #185 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motion to Stay, Certify, or Alternatively Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/18/2015. Replies due by 11/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schweickert, Christopher) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 205 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven N.H. Wood in Support of CMP/Biomax's Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order granting CMP/Biomaxs administrative motion to file document under seal, #3 Defendants Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Conditional Certification of Interlocutory Appeal of This Courts Order Overruling Defendants Claim of First Amendment Privilege, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Declaration of Steven N.H. Wood in Support (REDACTED), #4 Defendants Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Conditional Certification of Interlocutory Appeal of This Courts Order Overruling Defendants Claim of First Amendment Privilege, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Declaration of Steven N.H. Wood in Support (UNREDACTED))(Schweickert, Christopher) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 202 Supplemental Brief regarding the invocation of the 5th Am as to the identities of alleged "conspirators" filed byDavid Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER RE TRO MATERIALS AND MOTION TO QUASH by Judge William H. Orrick denying #193 Motion to Quash. In order to provide Johnson more time to gather documents requested by the subpoena, the deposition shall take place the week of November 16th. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 National Abortion Federation (NAF)s Memorandum Regarding Defendant David Daleidens Fifth Amendment Waiver (REDACTED), #4 National Abortion Federation (NAF)s Memorandum Regarding Defendant David Daleidens Fifth Amendment Waiver (Under Seal), #5 Declaration of Derek Foran, #6 Exhibit 1)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Opposition to Motion to Quash - Redacted, #4 Opposition to Motion to Quash - Under Seal, #5 Declaration of Derek Foran, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress NOTICE OF MANUAL LODGING [RE: DEFENDANTS THE CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS AND BIOMAX PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO NAF'S FIRST SET OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION [UNREDACTED]] (Seto, Stephen) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 195 Letter from Counsel for Mr. Daleiden, CMP, & BioMax in Response to NAF Letter. (Brejcha, Thomas) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 194 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation Corrected Certificate of Service of Deposition Subpoena on Charles C. Johnson (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 193 MOTION to Quash filed by Charles C Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meuser)(Meuser, Mark) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation of Deposition Subpoena on Charles C. Johnson (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER re #185 October 30, 2015 Order. Daleidin shall file a response to NAF's October 22, 2015 letter, not to exceed two pages, by 12:00 p.m. Tuesday November 3, 2015. The deposition authorized by the Court's October 30, 2015 Order shall not take place before the Court issues a further order, although service and scheduling may continue if underway. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/2/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 31, 2015 Filing 190 NOTICE by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press re #184 Reply to Opposition/Response, Notice of Withdrawal of Non-Party's Request for Unsealing of Response(s) to its Motion for Clarification Regarding Scope of Stipulated Protective Order and/or for a Telephonic Hearing (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 10/31/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 189 Letter from Catherine Short requesting leave to file response. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 188 NOTICE by National Abortion Federation re #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Notice of Submission of David Daleiden (AKA "Robert Sarkis")'s Deposition Transcript (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Deposition Transcript of David Daleiden, October 29, 2015)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER REGARDING SCOPE OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND DISCLOSED MATERIALS by Judge William H. Orrick re: #173 Motion for Clarification. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 184 REPLY (re #173 MOTION Clarification Regarding Scope of the Stipulated Protective Order ) Request for Unsealing of Response(s) to Motion for Clarification Regarding Scope of Stipulated Protective Order and/or for a Telephonic Hearing filed byReporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 183 Letter from Catherine Short re modification of briefing schedule. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 182 NOTICE by David Daleiden of manual lodging of Supp. Interrog. Responses, Unredacted (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 181 Letter dated 10/22/2015 from Counsel with Thomas More Society and Counsel with Life Legal Defense Foundation. Filed under seal per Chambers. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2015 Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 179 Brief re First Amendment privilege filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Doe)(Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Robinson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Memorandum Re Redaction of Identities, #4 Sealed Memorandum Re Redaction of Identities)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 177 Letter dated 10/19/2015 from Counsel for National Abortion Federation. Filed under seal per Chambers. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2015 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation of TRO on Charles C. Johnson (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 175 EXHIBITS re #173 MOTION Clarification Regarding Scope of the Stipulated Protective Order filed byReporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Related document(s) #173 ) (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 174 EXHIBITS re #173 MOTION Clarification Regarding Scope of the Stipulated Protective Order filed byReporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Related document(s) #173 ) (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION Clarification Regarding Scope of the Stipulated Protective Order filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. Responses due by 11/5/2015. Replies due by 11/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katie Townsend, #2 Proposed Order)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter to the Court, dated October 22, 2015, (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter to the Court, dated October 22, 2015, filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Robinson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Letter to the Court, dated October 22, 2015)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 170 Letter from Erik Zimmerman . (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 169 Letter from Catherine Short . (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER RESTRICTING INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS: DOCKET NOS. 57, 57-3, AND 57-4 by Hon. William H. Orrick re #59 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 Filing 167 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 16, 2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #163 Transcript Order, #165 Transcript Order, #164 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2016. (Related documents(s) #163 , #165 , #164 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER RESTRICTING ACCESS TO INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS: DOCKET NOS. 3-7 AND 3-20 by Hon. William H. Orrick re: #65 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (White, Edward) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by David Daleiden for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ON PENDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/16/2015. Supplemental production and briefs are due before 4:30 p.m. October 23, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 161 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Hearing as to discovery issues held on 10/16/2015. The discovery production must be supplemented by October 23, 2015. A written order specifying the discovery requirements will follow later in the day. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 159 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - The hearing set for 10:00 a.m. October 16, 2015 will be conducted in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation re #156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 157 Letter Joint Discovery Letter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7-1, #9 Exhibit 7-2, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Robinson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Discovery Letter, #4 Unredacted Joint Discovery Letter, #5 Redacted Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #6 Unredacted Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #7 Unredacted Ex. 6 to Foran Declaration, #8 Unredacted Ex. 7-1 to Foran Declaration, #9 Unredacted Ex. 7-2 to Foran Declaration, #10 Redacted Ex. 19 to Foran Declaration, #11 Unredacted Ex. 19 to Foran Declaration)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER RE CONGRESSIONAL SUBPOENA re #152 Letter filed by David Daleiden and #154 Letter filed by National Abortion Federation. Prior to responding to the Congressional subpoena, defendant CMP shall deliver to counsel for NAF and to the Court a true and correct copy of everything defendant will provide to Congress, including all video footage, documents and communications described in the subpoena. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/6/2015. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 154 Letter from Counsel for NAF in response to Docket No. #152 . (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 10/5/2015) Modified on 10/7/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER RE CONGRESSIONAL SUBPOENA - If plaintiff NAF wants to file a response to defendants' October 2, 2015 #152 Letter regarding compliance with the Congressional subpoena, it must do so on or before Monday October 5, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/2/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 152 Letter from Counsel, on behalf of David Daleiden regarding Congressional Subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (subpoena from Congress), #2 Exhibit B (Letter from Congress))(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by David Daleiden for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 150 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 09/28/15, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 9:02 - 9:43. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #148 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (Related documents(s) #148 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 28, 2015 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (White, Edward) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 28, 2015 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 28, 2015 Filing 147 ** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR. ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (White, Edward) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (djcS, ).
September 28, 2015 Filing 146 ** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (djcS, ).
September 28, 2015 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/28/2015. Discovery Hearing set for 10/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Hearing as to Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 12/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. FTR Time 9:02-9:43. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2015)
September 28, 2015 Filing 144 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Catherine Wynne Short Substitution of Counsel for Corporations (CMP and Biomax) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 143 Letter from Erik Zimmerman re: Sept. 28, 2015 conference. (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 142 Letter from Derek F. Foran to The Honorable William H. Orrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 141 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Dean John Sauer (Sauer, Dean) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 23, 2015 Reset Hearing incorrectly indicated by 138 Clerk's Notice. The Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 9/28/2015 09:00 AM. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER of USCA This court's stay entered September 17, 2015 is DISSOLVED and the petition for a writ of mandamus is DENIED; as to #128 Appellee's Brief, (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER of USCA The motion filed by the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press for leave to file an curiae letter brief is DENIED; as to #128 Appellee's Brief, (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 23, 2015 Filing 138 CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2015 09:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 to correct date. (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER REGARDING FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS OF CORPORATE ENTITIES. Biomax and CMP do not have any Fifth Amendment rights and may not invoke the Fifth Amendment in this case. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/23/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 22, 2015 Filing 136 USCA Case Number 15-72844 for #128 Appellee's Brief. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER of USCA Petitioner's emergency motion for a stay of discovery pending a decision on the petition for writ of mandamus is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; as to #128 Appellee's Brief (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER of USCAThis petition for a writ of mandamus raises issues that warrant an answer. Accordingly, on or before 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time on Friday, September 18, 2015, the real party in interest shall file an answer. as to #128 Appellee's Brief (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 133 NOTICE by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden re #119 Notice of Application for Writ Def.s' Not. of Filing in 9th Cir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def.'s Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2015. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorneys Linda E. Shostak, Derek F. Foran, and Christopher Robinson. Defendant Attorneys D. John Sauer, Catherine Wynne Short, Carly F. Gammill, Corrine Konczal, and Peter Breen. Amicus Attorneys (AZ) Maria M. Syms and Beau Roysden (appearing telephonically). (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 131 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against National Abortion Federation. Filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 130 NOTICE by National Abortion Federation re #119 Notice of Application for Writ Plaintiff's Notice of Ninth Circuit Filing of Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 129 NOTICE by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press of Filing of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Letter Brief in Support of Neither Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 128 ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS BY UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2015: #1 USCA Number: 15-72844) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Peter Breen. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 126 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/18/2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #125 Transcript Order, #123 Transcript Order, #124 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2015. (Related documents(s) #125 , #123 , #124 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Southerland, Abigail) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE by Troy Newman re #116 Order, Regarding Filing of Verified Pleading (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Southerland, Abigail) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE OF NINTH CIRCUIT FILING; by National Abortion Federation re #119 NOTICE TO DISTRICT COURT OF FILING OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS; Plaintiff's Notice of Ninth Circuit Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/17/2015) Modified on 9/18/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2015 Filing 120 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Peter Breen, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9838124.) filed by David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service certificate of good standing)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/15/2015) Modified on 9/16/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE TO DISTRICT COURT OF FILING OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS; by Catherine Wynne Short (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/14/2015) Modified on 9/18/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2015 Filing 118 Brief Def.'s Reply in Support of Invocation of 5th Am Re #103 Memorandum by Entity Defs (Corrected) Re #117 Brief filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/11/2015) Modified on 9/14/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2015 Filing 117 PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #118 FOR CORRECT E-FILING Brief Def.'s Reply in Support of Invocation of 5th Am re #103 Memorandum;by Entity Defs filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/11/2015) Modified on 9/14/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/14/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REGARDING INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THEIR FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2015. David Daleiden and Troy Newman shall each separately file an Assertion of Fifth Amendment Privilege document as described in this order on or before Thursday, September 17, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 115 Supplemental Brief re #61 MOTION clarification of TRO re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION (NAF)'S RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS THE CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS, BIOMAX PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC, AND DAVID DALEIDEN REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS AND TESTIMONIAL PRIVILEGE [DKT. NO. 110] filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 9, 2015 Filing 114 REPLY (re #109 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief ) filed byReporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 113 RESPONSE to re #103 Brief THE CMP DEFENDANTS' OPENING MEMORANDUM REGARDING INVOCATION OF FIFTH AMENDMENT PRIVILEGES BY THE ENTITY DEFENDANTS [DKT. NO. 103] by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Robinson in Support of National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Opposition to the CMP Defendants' Opening Memorandum Regarding Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privileges by the Entity Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 112 RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION clarification of TRO re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, ) RESPONSE TO THE MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY AMICI STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS IT RELATES TO ANY SUBPOENAS [DKT. 99-1] filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Melissa Fowler in Support of National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Response to the Memorandum of Law by Amici State Attorneys General Re: Defendants' Motion to Clarify Temporary Restraining Order as it Relates to Any Subpoenas [Dkt. No. 99-1], #2 Declaration Declaration of Nicholas S. Napolitan in Support of National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Response to the Memorandum of Law by Amici State Attorneys General Re: Defendants' Motion to Clarify Temporary Restraining Order as it Relates to Any Subpoenas [Dkt. No. 99-1], #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 111 RESPONSE (re #109 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief ) of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 110 Supplemental Brief re #61 MOTION clarification of TRO re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, Def.'s Supp Re Compliance w Supb and Testimonial Priv filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 109 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. Responses due by 9/17/2015. Replies due by 9/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Letter Brief, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Submit Amicus Curiae Letter)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
September 2, 2015 Filing 108 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/1/15, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #104 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2015. (Related documents(s) #104 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2015 re #57 and #61 MOTION clarification of TRO. Defendants are provided an opportunity to supplement their opening brief to address the Fifth Amendment issues raised at the hearing by Thursday, September 3, 2015 with a five-page brief targeted at the application of the Fifth Amendment privilege to the subpoena. Plaintiff shall respond to defendants' opening brief by Tuesday, September 8, 2015 and to the supplemental brief by September 10, 2015. No reply to the supplemental brief is needed. Court Reporter Name JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorneys Derek Foran, Nick Napolitan, and Christopher Robinson. Defendant Attorneys John Sauer, Corrine Konczal, and Abigail A. Southerland. Amici Attorneys Maria M. Syms and Brunn Roysden. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (White, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 Filing 103 Brief Opening Memo Regarding Invocation of 5th Am. Privileges filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING IN PART STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE AS AMICI CURIAE by Hon. William H. Orrick re #99 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 31, 2015 Filing 101 RESPONSE (re #99 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief ) National Abortion Federation (NAF)'s Opposition to Motion of Four State Attorneys General for Leave to Participate as Amici Curiae filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of D. Foran, #3 Exhibit A to D. Foran Decl.)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED PLEADING by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #96 Stipulation. NAF may file any amended pleading by September 18, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 29, 2015 Filing 99 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by State of Arizona. Responses due by 9/14/2015. Replies due by 9/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law By Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave)(Roysden, Brunn) (Filed on 8/29/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 98 REPLY (re #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Def.s' Mot to Clarify-Nucatola Transcript ) Def.'s Reply in Support of Mot to Clarify TRO as it relates to Nucatola Trans. filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 97 REPLY (re #61 MOTION clarification of TRO re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, ) Def.'s Reply in Support of Mot to Clarify TRO as it relates to subpoenas filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Filing of Amended Pleading filed by National Abortion Federation. (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16(G). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Corrine Gura Konczal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 93 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Corrine Konczal, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9789292.) filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Certif of Good Standing)(Brejcha, Thomas) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 92 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PURPOSES OF EXPEDITED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION DISCOVERY by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #82 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE by Troy Newman re #85 Brief of Withdrawal of Response in Support of Motion to Clarify Temporary Restraining Order (Southerland, Abigail) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail A Southerland (Southerland, Abigail) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 89 RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION clarification of TRO re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Robinson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 88 RESPONSE (re #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Def.s' Mot to Clarify-Nucatola Transcript ) filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Robinson, #2 Exhibit A)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Robinson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted NAF Opposition to Clarify TRO, #4 Unredacted NAF Opposition to Clarify TRO)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Scott Napolitan (Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 85 Brief re #57 MOTION clarification of TRO filed byTroy Newman. (Related document(s) #57 ) (Southerland, Abigail) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #83 STIPULATION Regarding Discovery Schedule, Motion Schedule, and Extension of the TRO filed by National Abortion Federation. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/25/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Schedule, Motion Schedule, and Extension of the TRO filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order for Purposes of Expedited Preliminary Injunction Discovery filed by National Abortion Federation. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Troy Newman for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (White, Edward) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 80 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/21/15, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #77 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (Related documents(s) #77 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Discovery Hearing held on 8/21/2015. Parties intend to brief the issue of whether the Fifth Amendment privilege may be invoked by the corporate entities and have agreed upon a briefing schedule. Defense opening brief to be filed by August 31, 2015; plaintiff response to be filed by September 7, 2015; and defense reply brief to be filed by September 10, 2015, with hearing to be scheduled at the Court's convenience. The parties agree that the hearing on October 9, 2015 for the Motion to Strike, the Motion to Dismiss, and the motion for a preliminary injunction shall be taken off calendar. The pending motions to clarify the TRO will go forward as scheduled on September 1, 2015. Court Reporter Name Pam Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney Linda E. Shostak, Christopher Robinson, and Derek F. Foran. Defendant Attorney John Sauer, Catherine W. Short, Carly Gammill, Edward L. White, III. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re #75 Corrected Stipulation For Shortening Briefing Schedule on Defendants' #61 MOTION for Clarification of TRO. Responses due by 8/25/2015. Replies due by 8/28/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/20/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 20, 2015 Filing 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #73 Stipulation Corrected Joint Stipulation For Shortening Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Clarify the Temporary Restraining Order filed by National Abortion Federation. (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 74 Letter from All Parties Joint Discovery Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 73 STIPULATION re #64 Order Shortening Briefing Schedule on Mots to Clarify filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 72 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (docket # 68 & 69) (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 71 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Robinson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Dkt. 58-3, #5 Unredacted Dkt. 58-3, #6 Unredacted Dkt. 58-6, #7 Redacted Dkt. 57, #8 Unredacted Dkt. 57, #9 Redacted Dkt. 57-3, #10 Unredacted Dkt. 57-3, #11 Redacted Dkt. 57-4, #12 Unredacted Dkt. 57-4, #13 Redacted Dkt. 3-7, #14 Unredacted Dkt. 3-7, #15 Unredacted Dkt. 3-20)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE AND /OR DISMISS IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMITS INSTANTER re #66 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #68 MOTION to Strike, and #69 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing reset for 10/9/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. The Court will address any issues relating to the scheduling of all motions at the discovery hearing on Friday, if one is requested. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/1/2015. Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 68 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Under California's Anti-SLAPP law filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/1/2015. Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 67 Declaration of CHRISTOPHER L. ROBINSON in Support of #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Def.s' Mot to Clarify-Nucatola Transcript and Exhibits filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Instanter filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Anti-SLAPP Mot and Mot to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Sauer, #3 Proposed Order Granting Excess Pages, #4 Proposed Order Granting Anti-SLAPP Mot & Mot to Dismiss)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 65 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document DOCKET NOS. 3-7 and 3-20 filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE MOTION TO CLARIFY TRO AND MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/14/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ) Def.s' Memo in Opposition to Pl.'s Mot to Show Cause filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Monex v Gilliam Compl., #2 Exhibit Sauer Declaration)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 62 Declaration of Catherine Short indicating service on designating partyre #58 Motion; filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/13/2015) Modified on 8/14/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION clarification of TRO re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. Responses due by 8/27/2015. Replies due by 9/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Def.s' Mot to Clarify-Nucatola Transcript filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion to Clarify, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Mot to clarify-to be sealed, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket Nos. 57, 57-3 and 57-4 filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order ISO Motion to Seal, #3 Motion for Order to Show Cause - Redacted, #4 Motion for Order to Show Cause - Under Seal, #5 Declaration in Support of Motion to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit 1 to Robinson Decl. ISO Motion to Show Cause, #7 Exhibit 2 to Robinson Decl. ISO Motion to Show Cause, #8 Exhibit 3 to Robinson Decl. ISO Motion to Show Cause, #9 Proposed Order ISO Motion to Show Cause)(Shostak, Linda) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION clarification of TRO filed by Center for Medical Progress. Responses due by 8/26/2015. Replies due by 9/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ltr. from Sen. Grassley, #2 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum, #3 Exhibit Letter to Chavez-Ochoa, #4 Exhibit Ltr. to Foran, #5 Exhibit Ltr. to C. Short)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 to restrict access temporarily pending Court's direction(jmdS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Brejcha. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Carly F. Gammill. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by D. John Sauer. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Abigail Southerland. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by John Joseph Williams, Jr. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Brejcha, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9751518.) filed by Center for Medical Progress. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit certificate of good standing)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John Sauer, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9751429.) filed by Center for Medical Progress. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit certificate of good standing)(Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Carly F. Gammill ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9749029.) filed by Troy Newman. (Gammill, Carly) (Filed on 8/11/2015) Modified on 8/12/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Alan Sekulow for Troy Newman (Sekulow, Jay) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Michael Zimmerman for Troy Newman (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward L. White, III for Troy Newman (White, Edward) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Catherine Wynne Short on behalf of Defendants Center for Medical Progress, et al., (Short, Catherine) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 44 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9747809.) filed by Troy Newman. (Williams, John) (Filed on 8/11/2015) Modified on 8/12/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9747748.) filed by Troy Newman. (Southerland, Abigail) (Filed on 8/11/2015) Modified on 8/12/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Edward L. White, III. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Erik M. Zimmerman. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Vladimir Frank Kozina For Defendants, the Center for Medical Progress, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis") (Kozina, Vladimir) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 38 Amended #35 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #35 ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9740198.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/7/15 filed by Troy Newman. (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 37 Amended #29 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #29 ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9733928.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/5/15 filed by Troy Newman. (White, Edward) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Vladimir Frank Kozina For Defendants, The Center for Medical Progress, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, David Daleiden (aka "Robert Sarkis"), and Troy Newman (Kozina, Vladimir) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 35 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #38 FOR THE CORRECT ATTACHMENT MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Erik Zimmerman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9740198.) filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Zimmerman, Erik) (Filed on 8/7/2015) Modified on 8/7/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/10/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting, with modifications, #33 Proposed Order. Joint discovery letter due by 8/19/2015. Discovery Hearing set for 8/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Motion Hearing re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 10/9/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/06/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 33 Proposed Order re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order re Extending TRO and Discovery and Preliminary Injunction Dates by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING #31 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 30 EXHIBITS re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction EXHIBIT 12 TO FORAN DECLARATION [DKT 3-2] CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [28-2] filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 29 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #37 FOR THE CORRECT ATTACHMENT MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Edward L. White ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9733928.) filed by Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (White, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2015) Modified on 8/6/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/10/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2015 Filing 28 EXHIBITS re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Exhibit 10 to Foran Declaration [Dkt 3-2] filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 to Foran Declaration [Dkt. 3-2], #See docket number #30 for the correct attachment (2) Exhibit 12 to Foran Declaration [Dkt 3-2])(Related document(s) #3 ) (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/4/2015) Modified on 8/6/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER KEEPING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IN EFFECT UNTIL RESOLUTION OF REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge William H. Orrick granting #5 Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery; finding as moot #6 Motion to Shorten Time. The temporary restraining order issued on July 31, 2015 remains in effect pending resolution of the preliminary injunction motion. A hearing on that motion is set for Thursday, August 27, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Set Hearings - Discovery Hearing set for 8/7/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing - Non-evidentiary held on 8/3/2015. Discovery may be served by noon on Wednesday, August 5, 2015. If there are objections to the propounded discovery, after a good faith effort to meet and confer to resolve those objections, a joint letter outlining any disputed issues should be filed by noon on Friday, August 7, 2015. Any hearing necessary to resolve the discovery disputes will be conducted on Friday, August 7, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff's Opening Brief and other papers in support of its request for a preliminary injunction should be filed by August 19, 2015. Opposition to the motion should be filed by August 24, 2015. A Reply, if any, should be filed by August 26, 2015. The hearing will occur on August 27, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. The Temporary Restraining Order issued July 31, 2015 remains in effect. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney Derek Foran, Christopher Robinson, and Alexandra Eve S. Laks. Defendant Attorney Brian R. Chavez-Ochoa and Catherine W. Short. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 25 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 3, 2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #24 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (Related documents(s) #24 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Abortion Federation for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 23 EXHIBITS re #22 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 22 RESPONSE (re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ) filed byBiomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Eve Laks (Laks, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Javier Serrano (Serrano, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2015 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 8/3/15. (Attachments: #1 WHO Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Abortion Federation (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Leonard Robinson for National Abortion Federation (NAF) (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa for Defendants (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - This Order and supporting papers must be served on Defendants as soon as possible, but no later than August 1, 2015. Any response or opposition to this Order to Show Cause must be filed and served on NAF's Counsel no later than August 3, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/3/2015 04:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/31/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Troy Newman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to David Daleiden. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Biomax Procurement Services, LLC. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Center for Medical Progress. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing on Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Derek F. Foran)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 5 Ex Parte Application for Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 4 Case assigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by National Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2See Docket Number #28 for the Correct Attachment(s) Declaration of Derek F. Foran, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, *** #7 Exhibit 5 DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9,*** #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12 EXHIBITS FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENTS LOCKED. DOCUMENTS TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, *** #20 Exhibit 18 DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Declaration of Jennifer Dunn, #32 Declaration of Dr. Matthew Reeves, #33 Declaration of Mark Mellor, #34 Declaration of Vicki Saporta)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/4/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/17/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2015 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Abortion Federation.. (Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden, Troy Newman ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9722660.). Filed byNational Abortion Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foran, Derek) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/3/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Abortion Federation v. Center for Medical Progress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress
Represented By: Corrine Gura Konczal
Represented By: Vladimir Frank Kozina
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Trissell
Represented By: Christopher James Schweickert
Represented By: Charles Salvatore LiMandri
Represented By: Catherine Wynne Short
Represented By: Bruce A. McIntosh
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Peter Christopher Breen,
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Schweickart
Represented By: Corrine L Purvis
Represented By: Stephen Chew Seto
Represented By: Steven Noel Housley Wood
Represented By: Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Represented By: Stephen C. Seto
Represented By: Paul Michael Jonna
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Brejcha, Jr
Represented By: Peter Christopher Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daleiden
Represented By: Corrine Gura Konczal
Represented By: Matthew F Heffron,
Represented By: Vladimir Frank Kozina
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Trissell
Represented By: Charles Salvatore LiMandri
Represented By: Catherine Wynne Short
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Peter Christopher Breen,
Represented By: Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Represented By: Paul Michael Jonna
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Brejcha, Jr
Represented By: Peter Christopher Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Newman
Represented By: Vladimir Frank Kozina
Represented By: John Joseph Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Abigail A Southerland
Represented By: Erik Michael Zimmerman
Represented By: Edward L. White, III
Represented By: Carly F. Gammill
Represented By: Jay Alan Sekulow
Represented By: Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Represented By: John Aloysius Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomax Procurement Services, LLC
Represented By: Corrine Gura Konczal
Represented By: Vladimir Frank Kozina
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Trissell
Represented By: Christopher James Schweickert
Represented By: Charles Salvatore LiMandri
Represented By: Catherine Wynne Short
Represented By: Steven N.H. Wood
Represented By: Bruce A. McIntosh
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Peter Christopher Breen,
Represented By: Christopher Schweickart
Represented By: Stephen Chew Seto
Represented By: Steven Noel Housley Wood
Represented By: Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Represented By: Stephen C. Seto
Represented By: Paul Michael Jonna
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Brejcha, Jr
Represented By: Peter Christopher Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Steven Cooley
Represented By: Matthew Jay Geragos
Represented By: Brentford Joseph Ferreira
Represented By: Vicki I. Podberesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Charles C Johnson
Represented By: Mark Philip Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Brentford J. Ferreira
Represented By: Matthew Jay Geragos
Represented By: Brentford Joseph Ferreira
Represented By: Vicki I. Podberesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arizona
Represented By: Maria Mazzeo Syms
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Represented By: Townsend KatieLynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Abortion Federation
Represented By: Lawrence Javier Serrano
Represented By: Christopher Leonard Robinson
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Napolitan
Represented By: Alexandra Eve Laks
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Mayo
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Represented By: Linda E. Shostak
Represented By: Diana Mariko Maltzer
Represented By: Nicholas Alan Roethlisberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Federation of America
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?