Patrick Connally v. Cole Valley Cafe et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Connally
Defendant: Cole Valley Cafe, In Ju Kim, Jung Im Kim, Hossam M. Kaddoura and Hanan F. Krayem
Case Number: 3:2015cv03543
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 39 Stipulation of Dismissal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
April 28, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, on the condition that all papers from the Court and from other parties shall continue to be served on Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell, LLP for forwarding purposes. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 14, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 19 Motion to Substitute Party. Michael Connally is granted leave to substitute in for his deceased brother, Patrick Connally, and shall file an amended complaint by April 18, 2016 to reflect the new plaintiff. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Connally v. Cole Valley Cafe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Connally
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Valley Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In Ju Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung Im Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hossam M. Kaddoura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanan F. Krayem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?