Johnson, et al v. GranCare, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Willie Johnson, Velma Bagby, Veronica Hudson, Eldridge Johnson, Cynthia Mackey, Latonya Morris, Arlana Johnson, Shonda Johnson, Azalia Johnson and William Johnson, Sr.
Defendant: GranCare, LLC, Mariner Health Care Management Company, Mariner Health Care, Inc., Remy Rhodes and FAS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03585
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
August 5, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/13/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
December 10, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 11/21/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/101/5. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 11 Motion to Remand. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
August 12, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/12/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, et al v. GranCare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GranCare, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Fernando Giovanniello
Represented By: Thomas Christian Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Health Care Management Company
Represented By: Alexander Fernando Giovanniello
Represented By: Thomas Christian Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remy Rhodes
Represented By: Alexander Fernando Giovanniello
Represented By: Thomas Christian Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Johnson
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velma Bagby
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Hudson
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldridge Johnson
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mackey
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Morris
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlana Johnson
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonda Johnson
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azalia Johnson
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Johnson, Sr.
Represented By: Richard Franklin Ingle
Represented By: James Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?