Harvey v. Google Inc.

Plaintiff: Susan Harvey
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03590
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
September 21, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSE THERETO filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
August 4, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/29/15 ORDERING that this CASE IS TRANSFERRED to USDC, Northern District of California. (Benson, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Sunita Bali
Represented By: Susan D. Fahringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Harvey
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Suren Naradha Weerasuriya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?