Riojas et al v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Hector Riojas and St. Mary's Center
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack and Will Lightbourne
Case Number: 3:2015cv03592
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Dismissal filed by Hector Riojas. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
July 27, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT re 52 ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
June 30, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
February 24, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline for Defendants to produce Administrative Records 3/9/2016. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 3/30/2016. Deadline to file cross-motions for summary judgment 4/20/2016. Opposition briefs due 6/1/2016. Rep ly briefs due 6/15/2016. Hearing on cross-motions for summary judgment set for 6/30/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
December 16, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff St. Mary's Center; Setting Dates for Federal Defendants' Answer, Rule 26(f) Conference, Case Management Conference filed by St. Mary's Center, Hector Riojas. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
August 14, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/14/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riojas et al v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Lightbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Riojas
Represented By: Stephen Eric Goldberg
Represented By: Stephanie Elisabeth Haffner
Represented By: Elise Keller Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Center
Represented By: Stephen Eric Goldberg
Represented By: Stephanie Elisabeth Haffner
Represented By: Elise Keller Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?