Alsheikh v. Lew et al

Plaintiff: Abdullah Saleh Alsheikh
Defendant: Jacob Lew and John A. Koskinen
Case Number: 3:2015cv03601
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 33 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
July 12, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John A. Koskinen, Jacob Lew. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
April 7, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
February 24, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jacob Lew. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
November 16, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CHANGE OF HEARING DATE re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 21 MOTION to Dismiss to request a change to the hearing date on defendant's motion to dismiss filed by Abdullah Saleh Alsheikh. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 21 MOTION to Dismiss to extend filing times for plaintiff's response and defendants' reply filed by Abdullah Saleh Alsheikh. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 13, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsheikh v. Lew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullah Saleh Alsheikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Lew
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Koskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?