Choudhuri v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Kabita Choudhuri
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Treena Berlinsky
Case Number: 3:2015cv03608
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2017 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Sanctions. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
October 5, 2017 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 138 Motion to Compel Deposition. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 12, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 135 136 Discovery Letter Briefs. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
May 4, 2017 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 112 113 114 115 Discovery Letters. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
September 13, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Responses due by 10/6/2016. Reply deadline 10/13/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/13/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
June 20, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Hon. Vince Chhabria on 6/20/2016. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 10, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 47 Motion to Dismiss.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
August 19, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. CASE REFERRED TO ADR UNIT FOR TELEPHONE CONFERNCE TO BE COMPLETED BY 9/17/2015. Reset Deadlines as to 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Responses due by 9/3/2015. Replies due by 9/17/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/18/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 11, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/11/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 10, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING TRO AND SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2015 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/10/2015. Plaintiff ordered to serve the defendants. Certificate of service as to plaintiff attached.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 7, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Hon. James Donato no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/7/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choudhuri v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kabita Choudhuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treena Berlinsky
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?