American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company et al v. Technichem, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Technichem, Inc., Mark J. Ng and Stephen S. Tung
Case Number: 3:2015cv03611
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2017 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/29/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
July 15, 2016 166 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
June 3, 2016 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT: re 123 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, 135 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Mark J. Ng. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/3/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
December 28, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reconsidering 53 Order on Motion to Shorten Time re 41 First MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/28/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
October 19, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company et al v. Technichem, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: W. David Campagne
Represented By: Stephen Ryan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: W. David Campagne
Represented By: Stephen Ryan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: W. David Campagne
Represented By: Stephen Ryan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technichem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?