Bailey v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Jolene Bailey
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv03612
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL RE: 22 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/11/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/8/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference and Release Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
October 29, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executice Committee on 10/29/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Bailey
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?