Welgus v. Trinet Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Howard Welgus
Defendant: Trinet Group, Inc., Burton M. Goldfield and William Porter
Case Number: 3:2015cv03625
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 66 , 69 , 74 , 76 MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/17/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
April 14, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 46 STIPULATION RE FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. ECF 43 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint terminated as moot. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
December 3, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 PLAINTIFF HOWARD WELGUS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
September 1, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING, IN PART, 15 STIPULATION CONCERNING SCHEDULING OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE THERETO, AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 4/21/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welgus v. Trinet Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Welgus
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinet Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Gallagher
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Matthew Austen Tolve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton M. Goldfield
Represented By: Richard L. Gallagher
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Matthew Austen Tolve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Porter
Represented By: Richard L. Gallagher
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Matthew Austen Tolve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?