Mann v. Gullickson

Plaintiff: Dharminder Mann
Defendant: Sara Gullickson
Case Number: 3:2015cv03630
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
July 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 27 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Harry Girard Lewis terminated. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
May 11, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference filed by Dharminder Mann Settlement Conference set for 6/29/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/11/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
October 22, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Gullickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Gullickson
Represented By: Harry Girard Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dharminder Mann
Represented By: Harvey William Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?