Betorina et al v. Randstad US, L.P.

Plaintiff: Marcus Betorina, Joseph Diaz and Fred Bell
Defendant: Randstad US, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03646
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CLASS NOTICE. Final Approval of Settlement Hearing set for 8/3/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward on 4/14/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 6, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
December 20, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Randstad US, L.P. Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
November 7, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Randstad US, L.P. Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/22/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
August 26, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 21 and Notice of Settlement to Vacate Case Management Conference filed by Fred Bell. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/27/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 13, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/13/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betorina et al v. Randstad US, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Betorina
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Represented By: Kyle Roald Nordrehaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Diaz
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Represented By: Kyle Roald Nordrehaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Bell
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Represented By: Kyle Roald Nordrehaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstad US, L.P.
Represented By: Duwayne Andre Carr
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Represented By: Michael Anderson Wahlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?