Anthony Ureta v. AT&T Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Ureta
Defendant: AT&T Inc. and AT&T Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03653
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2017 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 197 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
May 10, 2017 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 183 STIPULATION to Continue Further Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2017 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/10/2017. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
February 2, 2017 176 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 169 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
September 16, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER 108 to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment .Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/3/2016. Replies due by 11/17/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/16/2016.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
June 9, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/9/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
November 10, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 Stipulation filed by Marilyn Dito, Anthony Ureta Concerning Amendment of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/10/2015. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
August 27, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Aaron.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 21, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/21/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Ureta v. AT&T Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ureta
Represented By: Deirdre A Aaron
Represented By: Michael N Litrownik
Represented By: Jason C Marsili
Represented By: Brianna Marie Primozic
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?