Del Rio v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ricardo Del Rio
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc. and Rasier-CA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03667
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Referring Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
August 21, 2017 140 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/30/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
September 7, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/7/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
June 24, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
March 28, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 55 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Denying Without Prejudice 64 Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify FLSA Claims. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
February 24, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 72 : The Parties hereby stipulate and agree, through their undersigned counsel, that (1) Plaintiffs claims against Defendants shall be dismissed from the instant lawsuit; (2) Plaintiffs claims against Defendants shall be resolved in arbitration on an individual basis only, and not on a class or collective action basis; (3) Uber shall pay for the arbitrators costs and arbitration-specific fees pertaining to the aforementioned arbitration; (4) each party shall bear hi s or its respective attorneys fees incurred in relation to the instant action and the aforementioned arbitration, except as otherwise provided in any award of attorneys fees made by a judge or arbitrator in this action or the aforementioned arbitration; and (5) this stipulation and dismissal shall not influence the rights or obligations of Plaintiff Ricardo Del Rio. Tony Mehrdad Saghebian terminated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
January 29, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/29/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 15, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 52 regarding Defendants' Rule 12 Motion Briefing filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 5, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CORRECTIVE NOTICE. Responses due by January 6, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 16, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 16 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
October 23, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BRIEFING filed by Tony Mehrdad Saghebian, Ricardo Del Rio. Responses due by 11/11/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
September 14, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 11 Stipulation filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
August 26, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/26/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rio v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Del Rio
Represented By: Christopher James Hamner
Represented By: Evelina Maria Serafini, Esq.
Represented By: Amy Tai Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Fish, Jr.
Represented By: Robert G. Hulteng
Represented By: Roxanna Iran
Represented By: Andrew Michael Spurchise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier-CA, LLC
Represented By: John C. Fish, Jr.
Represented By: Robert G. Hulteng
Represented By: Roxanna Iran
Represented By: Andrew Michael Spurchise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?