Atkinson v. Urban Land Preservation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Atkinson
Defendant: Urban Land Preservation, LLC, Cowan-Newton, LLC, John Rowell and John Marren
Case Number: 3:2015cv03689
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
July 25, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' LETTER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 44 Letter filed by Gregory Atkinson, 43 Letter filed by Urban Land Preservation, LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
December 11, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 4, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 11 Motion to Remand (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 28, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION Show Cause Response due by 11/3/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/28/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
August 26, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/26/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkinson v. Urban Land Preservation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Land Preservation, LLC
Represented By: Kurt Frederic Vote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowan-Newton, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rowell
Represented By: Kurt Frederic Vote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Marren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Atkinson
Represented By: Charles Henry Rible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?