Walls v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Walls
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03716
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 STIPULATION Re Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/10/16. ***Civil Case Terminated.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
February 2, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/2/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
November 23, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT:Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/23/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 10, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Walls
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Represented By: John Herbert Scarpino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?